Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7723510 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2010 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | US74740907 | 11.05.2007 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | US49095504 | 15.09.2004 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9550993 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2017 | B2 | US2015315578 | 05.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | US201213472826 | 16.05.2012 | US201514609492 | 30.01.2015 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | US74740907 | 11.05.2007 | US49095504 | 15.09.2004 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | US77594710 | 07.05.2010 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9000144 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2015 | B2 | US2013245090 | 19.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | US201213472826 | 16.05.2012 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | US74740907 | 11.05.2007 | US49095504 | 15.09.2004 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | US77594710 | 07.05.2010 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8222394 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2012 | B2 | US2010292308 | 18.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | US74740907 | 11.05.2007 | US35833109 | 23.01.2009 | US49095504 | 15.09.2004 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8198428 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2012 | B2 | US2010286246 | 11.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | US74740907 | 11.05.2007 | US49095504 | 15.09.2004 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | US77595210 | 07.05.2010 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8207326 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2012 | B2 | US2010286245 | 11.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | US74740907 | 11.05.2007 | US49095504 | 15.09.2004 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | US77594710 | 07.05.2010 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7838662 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2010 | B2 | US2010113561 | 06.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | US55059609 | 31.08.2009 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | US74740907 | 11.05.2007 | US49095504 | 15.09.2004 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7838664 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2010 | B2 | US2010099748 | 22.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | US55070409 | 31.08.2009 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | US74740907 | 11.05.2007 | US49095504 | 15.09.2004 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7838663 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2010 | B2 | US2010093837 | 15.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | US74740907 | 11.05.2007 | US49095504 | 15.09.2004 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | US55060209 | 31.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7838661 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2010 | B2 | US2010087513 | 08.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | US55058609 | 31.08.2009 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | US74740907 | 11.05.2007 | US49095504 | 15.09.2004 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7838660 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2010 | B2 | US2010087512 | 08.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | US74740907 | 11.05.2007 | US49095504 | 15.09.2004 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | US55057909 | 31.08.2009 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7232806 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2007 | B2 | US2005059005 | 17.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4371812B | Global Dossier | 25.11.2009 | B2 | JP2005503827 | 10.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL219310 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2447370 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2018 | B1 | EP2447370 | 02.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP11175534 | 27.09.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02782801 | 27.09.2002 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2428571 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2018 | B1 | EP2428571 | 14.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02782801 | 27.09.2002 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP11175601 | 27.09.2002 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2428570 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2018 | B1 | EP2428570 | 14.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02782801 | 27.09.2002 | EP11175598 | 27.09.2002 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2428569 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2018 | B1 | EP2428569 | 14.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP11175595 | 27.09.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02782801 | 27.09.2002 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2428568 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2018 | B1 | EP2428568 | 14.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP11175566 | 27.09.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02782801 | 27.09.2002 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2428567 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2018 | B1 | EP2428567 | 14.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02782801 | 27.09.2002 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP11175529 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2390331 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2018 | B1 | EP2390331 | 30.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02782801 | 27.09.2002 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP11175608 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2390330 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2018 | B1 | EP2390330 | 30.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02782801 | 27.09.2002 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP11175590 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2390329 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2018 | B1 | EP2390329 | 30.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP11175577 | 27.09.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02782801 | 27.09.2002 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2390328 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP11175572 | 27.09.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02782801 | 27.09.2002 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2386637 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2018 | B1 | EP2386637 | 29.02.2012 | A3 | EP2386637 | 16.11.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP11175587 | 27.09.2002 | EP02782801 | 27.09.2002 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2385123 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2018 | B1 | EP2385123 | 09.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02782801 | 27.09.2002 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP11175570 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2385122 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2018 | B1 | EP2385122 | 09.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02782801 | 27.09.2002 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP11175536 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1430128 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2018 | B1 | EP1430128 | 23.06.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02782801 | 27.09.2002 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2937159 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2017 | C | CA2937159 | 10.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | CA2462144 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2462144 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2016 | C | CA2462144 | 10.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002347035B | Global Dossier | 03.04.2008 | B2 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2224003 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2018 | B1 | EP2224003 | 05.01.2011 | A3 | EP2224003 | 01.09.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02782801 | 27.09.2002 | EP10155080 | 27.09.2002 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL161100 | 31.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | EP0210881 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03029459 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2003 | A3 | WO03029459 | 10.04.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5963735B | Global Dossier | 03.08.2016 | B2 | JP2014094008 | 22.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5473432B | Global Dossier | 16.04.2014 | B2 | JP2009278981 | 03.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | EP02016772 | 26.07.2002 | EP01123453 | 28.09.2001 | EP02006712 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Earlier application | EP1430128 |