EP2230017 - Centrifugal force-based microfluidic device and method of fabricating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2010/38] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Chung ung No. 108-504, Daewoo Prugio, Seongbok-dong, Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Ki ju No. 308-804, Jugong Greenvill Apt., Maetan 3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Park, Jong jin No. 317-801, Hyundai Morningside 1-cha Apt., Bora-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Cho, Dong hwi No. 212-502, Gwonseon SK View Apt., 1036, Gwongseong-dong Gwonseong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Bae, Su bong No. 3-1511, Samsung 1-cha Apt., Maetan 4-dong, Yeong-tong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Kim, Jong cheol No. 29-202, Jangmi Apt., Jamsil-6-dong, Songpa-gu Seoul / KR | [2010/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10155110.9 | 02.03.2010 | [2010/38] | Priority number, date | KR20090021003 | 12.03.2009 Original published format: KR 20090021003 | [2010/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2230017 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
B01L3/50273 (EP,US);
G01N35/02 (KR);
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
G01N15/042 (KR);
G01N35/10 (KR);
B01L2200/0642 (EP,US);
B01L2200/141 (EP,US);
B01L2300/044 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0803 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0806 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0887 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0409 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/38] | Title | German: | Zentrifugalkraftbasierte mikrofluidische Vorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2010/38] | English: | Centrifugal force-based microfluidic device and method of fabricating the same | [2010/38] | French: | Dispositif microfluidique à base de force centrifuge et son procédé de fabrication | [2010/38] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 22.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 13.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03064996 (BURSTEIN TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7* page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 31; figure 1 *; | [X]US2005221281 (HO WINSTON Z [US]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0059]; figures 3-5 *; | [X]US2006023208 (MURAKAMI KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8 * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0094]; figure 7a *; | [X]EP1889661 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0066]; figures 6a-6d *; | [X]WO2008080046 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-12 * page 50, line 13 - page 54, line 3; figures 19b-19d,21 * |