EP2226436 - A flushing tank operating plate/counterplate assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALSIR S.p.A. Località Merlaro, 2 25078 Vestone (BS) / IT | [2010/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Varotti, Mario Via Mocenigo, 100 25078 Vestone / IT | [2010/36] | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2013/23] |
Former [2010/36] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 10155614.0 | 05.03.2010 | [2010/36] | Priority number, date | IT2009MI00339 | 06.03.2009 Original published format: IT MI20090339 | [2010/36] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2226436 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E03D1/012, F16B21/18, E03D5/02 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
E03D1/012 (EP);
E03D5/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spülkastenbedienplatten/-gegenplattenanordnung | [2010/36] | English: | A flushing tank operating plate/counterplate assembly | [2010/36] | French: | Ensemble de contreplaque/plaque fonctionnant sur un réservoir de chasse d'eau | [2010/36] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 29.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 17.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE202007001880U (TECE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-13,15-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE20315778U (BOELLHOFF GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-13,15-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE202008007513U (EISENBERG GMBH SANITAERTECHNIK [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9,10,15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1491690 (VALSIR SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-7,9,15 * the whole document * |