EP2278230 - Outdoor unit for air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2017/31] |
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOCHIZUKI, Tatsuya c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED 1-13-5, Kudankita Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | 02 /
KUBONO, Toshiyuki c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED 1-13-5, Kudankita Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | 03 /
YAMAUCHI, Norio c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED 1-13-5, Kudankita Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | 04 /
JINNAI, Hiroyuki c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED 1-13-5, Kudankita Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | [2017/30] |
Former [2011/04] | 01 /
Tatsuya, Mochizuki c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED 1-13-5, Kudankita Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | ||
02 /
Toshiyuki, Kubono c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED 1-13-5, Kudankita Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | |||
03 /
Norio, Yamauchi c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED 1-13-5, Kudankita Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | |||
04 /
Hiroyuki, Jinnai c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED 1-13-5, Kudankita Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2011/04] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10155742.9 | 08.03.2010 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | JP20090145973 | 19.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009145973 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2278230 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2278230 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2278230 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F24F1/00, F24F13/20 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
F24F1/38 (EP,US);
F24F1/06 (EP,US);
F24F13/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] |
Former [2011/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Außeneinheit für eine Klimaanlage | [2011/04] | English: | Outdoor unit for air conditioner | [2011/04] | French: | Unité d'extérieur pour climatiseur | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2010 | AT | 02.08.2017 | CY | 02.08.2017 | CZ | 02.08.2017 | DK | 02.08.2017 | EE | 02.08.2017 | ES | 02.08.2017 | FI | 02.08.2017 | HR | 02.08.2017 | LT | 02.08.2017 | LV | 02.08.2017 | MC | 02.08.2017 | MK | 02.08.2017 | NL | 02.08.2017 | PL | 02.08.2017 | PT | 02.08.2017 | RO | 02.08.2017 | SE | 02.08.2017 | SI | 02.08.2017 | SK | 02.08.2017 | SM | 02.08.2017 | TR | 02.08.2017 | BG | 02.11.2017 | NO | 02.11.2017 | GR | 03.11.2017 | IS | 02.12.2017 | GB | 08.03.2018 | IE | 08.03.2018 | LU | 08.03.2018 | MT | 08.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | FR | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 08.03.2010 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
GB | 08.03.2018 | ||
IE | 08.03.2018 | ||
LU | 08.03.2018 | ||
MT | 08.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
GB | 08.03.2018 | ||
IE | 08.03.2018 | ||
LU | 08.03.2018 | ||
MT | 08.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
GB | 08.03.2018 | ||
IE | 08.03.2018 | ||
LU | 08.03.2018 | ||
MT | 08.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
GB | 08.03.2018 | ||
IE | 08.03.2018 | ||
LU | 08.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
GB | 08.03.2018 | ||
IE | 08.03.2018 | ||
LU | 08.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 08.03.2018 | ||
LU | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 02.08.2017 | |
NO | 02.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08178364 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]JPH08178365 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1,4 * abstract *; | [XP]JP2009257603 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [XP] 1-4 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2005083587 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * | by applicant | JPH04132336U |