EP2364888 - Seatbelt device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | For all designated states Technische Universität Berlin Strasse des 17. Juni 135 10623 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | ||
For all designated states Technische Universität Berlin Strasse des 17. Juni 135 10623 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kerkeling, Christoph c/o Honda R & D Europe (Deutschland) GmbH Carl-Legien-Strasse 30 63073 Offenbach/Am Main / DE | 02 /
Eisenach, Alexander c/o ILS TU Berlin TUB 13 Gustav-Meyer-Allee 25 13355 Berlin / DE | [2012/07] |
Former [2011/37] | 01 /
Kerkeling, Christoph c/o Honda R & D Europe (Deutschland) GmbH Carl-Legien-Strasse 30 63073 Offenbach/Am main / DE | ||
02 /
Eisenach, Alexander c/o ILS TU Berlin TUB 13 Gustav-Meyer-Allee 25 13355 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10155821.1 | 08.03.2010 | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2364888 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2364888 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/03 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
B60R22/26 (EP);
B60N2/688 (EP);
B60R22/02 (EP);
B60R2022/027 (EP);
B60R2022/1818 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/37] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsgurtvorrichtung | [2011/37] | English: | Seatbelt device | [2011/37] | French: | Dispositif de ceinture de sécurité | [2011/37] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2010 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 07.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2010 | AT | 29.02.2012 | BE | 29.02.2012 | CY | 29.02.2012 | CZ | 29.02.2012 | DK | 29.02.2012 | EE | 29.02.2012 | FI | 29.02.2012 | HR | 29.02.2012 | IT | 29.02.2012 | LT | 29.02.2012 | LV | 29.02.2012 | MK | 29.02.2012 | MT | 29.02.2012 | NL | 29.02.2012 | PL | 29.02.2012 | RO | 29.02.2012 | SE | 29.02.2012 | SI | 29.02.2012 | SK | 29.02.2012 | SM | 29.02.2012 | TR | 29.02.2012 | IE | 08.03.2012 | LU | 08.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | BG | 29.05.2012 | NO | 29.05.2012 | GR | 30.05.2012 | ES | 09.06.2012 | IS | 29.06.2012 | PT | 29.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MK | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
SM | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
LU | 08.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MK | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MK | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MK | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MK | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MK | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 29.02.2012 | |
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6293588 (CLUNE ELMER F [US]) [A] 1-3 * figures 4-6 *; | [A]EP1942036 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2000371 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1-3 * figures 3-4 *; | [A]DE102008026410 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3* the whole document * | by applicant | JPH07291092 |