EP2228516 - A method and apparatus for gas turbine engine temperature management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2010/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hatman, Anca 113 Gayle Ridge Drive Easley, SC 29642 / US | [2010/37] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2010/37] | Gray, Thomas GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10155886.4 | 09.03.2010 | [2010/37] | Priority number, date | US20090400916 | 10.03.2009 Original published format: US 400916 | [2010/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2228516 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2228516 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, F01D9/02, F01D9/04 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
F01D5/186 (EP,US);
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F01D9/023 (EP,US);
F01D9/041 (EP,US);
F05D2240/81 (EP,US);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2010/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Temperaturregelung in einem Gasturbinentriebwerk | [2010/37] | English: | A method and apparatus for gas turbine engine temperature management | [2010/37] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de réglage de température dans un moteur de turbine à gaz | [2010/37] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2010 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 06.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/12] | 14.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102008002890 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0005] , [ 0007] , [ 0012] , [ 0020] , [ 0022] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0073] * * figures 1-2 *; | [Y]US2005100437 (PHILLIPS JAMES S [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0017] - paragraph [0021] * * figures 1-4 *; | [I]US2005111965 (LOWE CEDRIC C [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0005] - paragraphs [0011] , [ 0014] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1798379 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0011] , [ 0046] , [0054] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 2-3 * |