EP2189137 - Warming device with interleaved separately inflatable sections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states Arizant Healthcare Inc. 10393 West 70th Street Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Thomas P. 13289 Alabama Avenue South Savage, MN 55378 / US | [2013/36] |
Former [2010/21] | 01 /
Anderson, Thomas P. 13289 Alabama Avenue South Savage, MN 55378 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/21] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 10156137.1 | 06.12.2005 | [2010/21] | Priority number, date | US20040006491 | 07.12.2004 Original published format: US 6491 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2189137 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2189137 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2189137 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/02, // A61F7/00 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
A61F7/02 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0001 (EP,US);
A61F2007/006 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0234 (EP,US);
A61F7/0097 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/21] | A61F7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | Erwärmungsgerät mit verschachtelten separat aufblasbaren Sektionen | [2010/21] | English: | Warming device with interleaved separately inflatable sections | [2010/21] | French: | Outil de chauffage avec des sections entrelacées gonflables séparément | [2010/21] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 19.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05853202.9 / EP1824432 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050853202) is 08.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2005 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | ES | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | IT | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | NL | 04.09.2013 | PL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | TR | 04.09.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IE | 06.12.2013 | LU | 06.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
TR | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IE | 06.12.2013 | ||
LU | 06.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IE | 06.12.2013 | ||
LU | 06.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
LU | 06.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
LU | 06.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
LU | 06.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9714381 (MALLINCKRODT MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * figure 3 *; | [A]US5785716 (BAYRON HARRY [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 44 - line 52; figure 3A *; | [A]US5968084 (AUGUSTINE SCOTT D [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * figure 5 *; | [AD]WO03086500 (ARIZANT HEALTHCARE INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]WO2004004500 (MOELNLYCKE HEALTH CARE AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-3* abstract * | by applicant | US5304213 | US5360439 | US5443488 | US5620482 | US6524332 | WO03086500 | EP1824432 | - MAHONEY ET AL., "Maintaining intraoperative normothermia: A metaanalysis of outcomes with costs", AANA JOURNAL, vol. 4/99, no. 67,2, pages 155 - 164 | WO2005US44214 |