EP2264174 - Protein similar to neuroendocrine-specific protein, and encoding CDNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michalovich, David GlaxoSmithKline New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow Essex CM17 5AW / GB | 02 /
Prinjha, Rabinder Kumar GlaxoSmithKline New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow Essex CM19 5AW / GB | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Chiappinelli, Susan Ann, et al GSK Legal & Compliance - Global Patents 79 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1DG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Sayce, Alastair George, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10156270.0 | 21.07.1999 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | GB19980016024 | 22.07.1998 Original published format: GB 9816024 | GB19990016898 | 19.07.1999 Original published format: GB 9916898 | [2010/51] | Previously filed application, date | WO1999GB02360 | 21.07.1999 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2264174 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2264174 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, G01N33/68, C12Q1/68 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C12N9/2497 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2010/51] | Title | German: | Protein, das mit einem Neuroendokrinspezifischen Protein änhelt, und dafür kodierende cDNS | [2010/51] | English: | Protein similar to neuroendocrine-specific protein, and encoding CDNA | [2010/51] | French: | Protéine semblable à la protéine spécifique des cellules neuroendocriniennes et ADNc codant | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 17.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/16] | 09.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99934913.7 / EP1098972 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990934913) is 04.05.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 20.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.04.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 17.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.01.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9806841 (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 2, line 43 - page 3, line 20; figures 2,6 * * page 7, line 41 - page 9, line 14 * * page 16, lines 23-30 * * page 18, line 33 - page 19, line 13 * * page 35, line 33 - page 36, line 7 * * 99% identity between Seq.ID:1 nt.108-674 and Seq.ID:1 of current application nt.3013-3579 99% identity between Seq.ID:2 and Seq.ID:2 of current application aa.1005-1192; page 38 - page 39 * * page 46; claims 1-14 *; | [X]WO9817687 (GENETICS INST [US]) [X] 1-12 * page 6, line 32 - page 8, line 19 * * page 23, line 12 - page 24, line 14 * * page 34, lines 16-22 * * page 54, line 17 - page 55, line 5 * * 99% identity between Seq.ID:8 nt.1-1714 and Seq.ID:1 of current application nt.1535-3246 99% identity between Seq.ID:9 and Seq.ID:2 of current application aa.546-1192; page 73 - page 77 * * page 101 - page 102; claims 20-22 *; | [XP]WO9845435 (GENETICS INST [US]) [XP] 1-12 * page 56, lines 28-34 * * page 64, lines 10-14 * * page 77, line 15 - page 78, line 2 * * page 83, lines 16-30 * * 100% identity between Seq.ID:1008 and Seq.ID:1 of current application nt.1540-1971; page 428 *; | [XP]WO9845437 (GENETICS INST [US]) [XP] 1-12 * page 56, lines 28-34 * * page 64, lines 10-14 * * page 77, line 15 - page 78, line 2 * * page 83, lines 16-30 * * 99% identity between Seq.ID:366 and Seq.ID:1 of current application nt.862-1184; page 213 *; | [XP]WO9856804 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-12 * abstract * * page 62, lines 1-32 * * Gene No.69; page 82 * * page 85, line 29 - page 87, line 11 * * page 95, line 34 - page 96, line 32 * * page 111, line 6 - page 112, line 16 * * 99% identity between Seq.ID:79 nt.248-814 and Seq.ID:1 of current application nt.3013-3579; page 235 - page 236 * * 100% identity between Seq.ID:179 and Seq.ID:2 of current application aa.1019-1192; page 303 * * 99% identity between Seq.ID:301 and Seq.ID:2 of current application aa.1002-1192; page 354 - page 355 * * page 370 - page 373; claim - *; | [XP]WO9906548 (GENSET SA [FR], et al) [XP] 1-12 * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 27 * * page 78, line 6 - page 79, line 2; example 39 * * page 84, line 1 - page 85, line 24; example 43 * * 99% identity between Seq.ID:137 nt.165-404 and Seq.ID:1 of current application nt.3013-3252 97% identity between Seq.ID:391 and Seq.ID:2 of current application aa.1002-1084; page 144 - page 148; claim - *; | [XP]WO9931236 (GENSET SA [FR], et al) [XP] 1-12 * abstract * * page 5, lines 21-34 * * page 32, lines 3-8 * * page 62, line 21 - page 63, line 5; example 38 * * page 64, line 11 - page 67, line 27; examples 39,40 * * 99% identity between Seq.ID:51 nt.68-634 and Seq.ID:1 of current application nt.3013-3579 98% identity between Seq.ID:152 and Seq.ID:2 of current application aa.1002-1192; page 137 - page 138; claim - *; | [XP]WO9933979 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [XP] 1-12 * 99% identity between Seq.ID:5 nt.687-1253 and Seq.ID:1 of current application nt.3013-3579 100% identity between Seq.ID:6 aa.1-185 and Seq.ID:2 of current application aa.1-185; page 23, lines 5-15 * * page 33, lines 8-15 * * page 44, lines 4-9 * * page 49, line 24 - page 50, line 10 * * page 59 - page 67; claim - *; | [X] - EMBL NUCLEOTIDE SEQU, (19000101), Database accession no. AA307342, XP002120596 [X] 1-9,11,12 * the whole document * | [XP] - MORRIS N.J. ET AL., "Cloning and characterization of a 22 kDa protein from rat adipocytes: a new member of the reticulon family", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (19990506), vol. 1450, no. 1, pages 68 - 76, XP002121224 [XP] 1-9,11,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-4889(99)00033-6 | [XP] - NAGASE T. ET AL., "Prediction of the coding sequences of unidentified human genes. XII. The complete sequences of 100 new cDNA clones from brain which code for large proteins in vitro", DNA RESEARCH, (199812), vol. 5, no. 5, ISSN 1340-2838, pages 355 - 364 64, XP002111974 [XP] 1-5,11,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/dnares/5.6.355 | Examination | - PRINJHA R ET AL, "Inhibitor of neurite outgrowth in humans.", NATURE 27 JAN 2000, (20000127), vol. 403, no. 6768, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 383 - 384, XP055060480 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35000287 | - GRANDPRE TADZIA ET AL, "Identification of the Nogo inhibitor of axon regeneration as a Reticulon protein", NATURE (LONDON), (20000127), vol. 403, no. 6768, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 439 - 444, XP001010115 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35000226 | - SPILLMANN ET AL, "Identification and Characterization of a Bovine Neurite Growth Inhibitor (bNI-220)", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, (19980724), vol. 273, no. 30, doi:10.1074/JBC.273.30.19283, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 19283 - 19293, XP002162896 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.30.19283 | - CHEN M S ET AL, "MOLECULAR CLONING OF A GENE FOR A PUTATIVE INHIBITOR TO CNS REGENERATION", ABSTRACTS OF THE ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19970101), vol. 23, no. 1/02, ISSN 0190-5295, page 1723+AN675.16, XP001070928 | by applicant | EP0232262 | US4946778 | - J. HENS ET AL., CELL TISSUE RES., (1998), vol. 292, pages 229 - 237 | - GEISLER ET AL., MAMM. GENOME, (1998), vol. 9, pages 164 - 173 | - SPILLMANN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 15487 - 15493 | - SENDEN ET AL., HISTOCHEM. CELL BIOL., (1997), vol. 108, pages 155 - 165 | - ROEBROEK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 13439 - 13447 | - ADAMS, M.D. ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 377, page 3 | - GENTZET, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 821 - 824 | - FROHMAN ET AL., PROC NAT ACAD SCI USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 8998 - 9002 | - COTTONET, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1985), vol. 85, pages 4397 - 4401 | - M.CHEE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, pages 610 - 613 | - WALTER, M.; SPILLETT, D.; THOMAS, P.; WEISSENBACH, J.; GOODFELLOW, P., "A method for constructing radiation hybrid maps of whole genomes", NATURE GENETICS, (1994), vol. 7, pages 22 - 28 | - GYAPAY G; SCHMITT K; FIZAMES C; JONES H; VEGA-CZARNY N; SPILLETT D; MUSELET D; PRUD'HOMME JF; DIB C; AUFFRAY C, "A radiation hybrid map of the human genome", HUM MOL GENET, (199603), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 339 - 46 | - SCHENAET, SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, pages 467 - 470 | - SHALON ET AL., GENOME RES, (1996), vol. 6, pages 639 - 645 | - KOHLER, G.; MILSTEIN, C., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - KOZBOR ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1983), vol. 4, page 72 | - SCHULLEK ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM., (1997), vol. 246, pages 20 - 29 | - D. BENNETT ET AL., J MOL RECOGNITION, (1995), vol. 8, pages 52 - 58 | - K. JOHANSON ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1995), vol. 270, no. 16, pages 9459 - 9471 | - SEIFTER ET AL., "Analysis for protein modifications and nonprotein cofactors", METH ENZYMOL, (1990), vol. 182, pages 626 - 646 | - RATTAN ET AL., "Protein Synthesis: Post-translational Modifications and Aging", ANN NY ACAD SCI, (1992), vol. 663, pages 48 - 62 | - DEVEREUX J ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1984), vol. 12, pages 387 - 395 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, J MOL BIOL, (1981), vol. 147, pages 195 - 197 | - ADVANCES IN APPLIED MATHEMATICS, (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 | - NEDDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J MOL BIOL, (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - ALTSCHUL S F ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - ALTSCHUL S F ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 389 - 3402 | - PEARSON W R, METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1990), vol. 183, pages 63 - 99 | - PEARSON W R; LIPMAN D J, PROC NAT ACAD SCI USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 2444 - 2448 | - HENIKOFF S; HENIKOFF J G, PROC. NAT. ACAD SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919 |