17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
04.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
30.08.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
28.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
07.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
24.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
10.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
03.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
12.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
21.09.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
14.09.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
14.09.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
11.09.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.09.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.05.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.06.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
05.11.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] |