EP2258452 - Gyroscopic exerciser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Logistic Enterprises, Inc. 4040 E. Post Road Las Vegas NV 89120 / US | [2012/42] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Smith, Tom Yorba Linda California / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Tom Yorba Linda, 1144 Grove St. Anaheim, CA 92806-2109 / US | [2012/42] |
Former [2010/49] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Hellmich, Wolfgang European Patent and Trademark Attorney Lortzingstrasse 9 / 2. Stock 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Hellmich, Wolfgang Lortzingstrasse 9 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/49] | Hellmich, Wolfgang Lortzingstrasse 9 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10156767.5 | 17.03.2010 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | US20090455685 | 05.06.2009 Original published format: US 455685 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2258452 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2258452 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A63B21/22, F02N3/02 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
A63B21/22 (EP,US);
A63B21/0004 (EP,US);
A63B21/222 (EP,US);
F02N3/02 (EP,US);
A63B21/4043 (EP,US);
A63B23/03525 (EP,US);
A63B23/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | Gyroskopisches Übungsgerät | [2010/49] | English: | Gyroscopic exerciser | [2010/49] | French: | Exercice gyroscopique | [2010/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 30.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2010 | AT | 24.10.2012 | BE | 24.10.2012 | CY | 24.10.2012 | DK | 24.10.2012 | EE | 24.10.2012 | HR | 24.10.2012 | LT | 24.10.2012 | LV | 24.10.2012 | MK | 24.10.2012 | MT | 24.10.2012 | RO | 24.10.2012 | SI | 24.10.2012 | SK | 24.10.2012 | SM | 24.10.2012 | BG | 24.01.2013 | NO | 24.01.2013 | GR | 25.01.2013 | IS | 24.02.2013 | PT | 25.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MK | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | HR | 24.10.2012 | |
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | NO | 24.01.2013 | |
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | NO | 24.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2564787 (MACK PERRY E) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5800311 (CHUANG P S [TW]) [A] 1-15 * column 3 - column 5; figure - *; | [A]DE202007010179U (LIN MING HUNG [TW]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0039]; figure - *; | [A]EP1950413 (STARTING IND [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0015] - [0035]; figure - *; | [AD]US2008242508 (SMITH TOM [US]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2564787 | US5800311 | DE202007010179U | EP1950413 | US2008242508 |