EP2233023 - A device for soles of shoes suitable for increasing the elevation of the user, and shoes provided with said device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chiabotto, Paolo Via Soracco, 49 12045 Fossano (CN) / IT | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/10] |
Former [2010/39] | Robba, Pierpaolo Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto 35 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 10157001.8 | 19.03.2010 | [2010/39] | Priority number, date | IT2009TO00220 | 23.03.2009 Original published format: IT TO20090220 | [2010/39] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2233023 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/18 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
A43B13/183 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hochsprungvorrichtung für Schuhsohle und Schuh mit solcher Vorrichtung | [2010/39] | English: | A device for soles of shoes suitable for increasing the elevation of the user, and shoes provided with said device | [2010/39] | French: | Dispositif de déplacement pour semelle de chaussure et chaussure avec ledit dispositif | [2010/39] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/41] | 27.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE8508599U (J. SCHNELL) [XD] 1-5,9,10 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 12; figures 2,3 *; | [XD]US2006021262 (KILLION DAVID L [US]) [XD] 1,3,9,10 * paragraph [0157]; figure 4 *; | [AD]WO2008125716 (MARTINEZ DIAZ ABRAHAM [ES]) [AD] 1-4,6,9,10 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2006047908 (LENG WANEN [CN]) [AD] 1,9 * figure 11 * | by applicant | IT1234072 | US5528842 | US6928756 | WO2008125716 | US2006021262 | WO2006047908 | DE8508599U | US2003093921 |