EP2211006 - Domestic appliance with a door bearing bracket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/30] | domestic appliance with a door bearing bracket | ||
[2014/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kentner, Wolfgang Am Kirlesberg 14 89365 Röfingen / DE | 02 /
Laible, Karl-Friedrich Ahornweg 53 89129 Langenau / DE | 03 /
Steichele, Helmut Lindenstraße 16 89415 Lauingen / DE | [2014/15] |
Former [2010/30] | 01 /
Kentner, Wolfgang Am Kirlesberg 14 89365 Röfingen / DE | ||
02 /
Laible, Karl-Friedrich Ahornweg 53 89129 Langenau / DE | |||
03 /
Steichele, Helmut Lindenstraße 16 89415 Lauingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10157728.6 | 13.05.2003 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | DE2002121895 | 16.05.2002 Original published format: DE 10221895 | [2010/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2211006 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2211006 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/08, A47B91/02, E05D7/00, F25D23/02, E05D7/10, E05D7/12, E05D11/00, E05D5/10 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
E05D11/00 (EP);
A47B91/024 (EP);
E05D7/081 (EP);
E05D7/1044 (EP);
E05D7/123 (EP);
F25D23/028 (EP);
E05D2005/102 (EP);
E05D7/0027 (EP);
E05D7/12 (EP);
E05Y2600/56 (EP);
E05Y2600/622 (EP);
E05Y2600/626 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2010/30] | E05D7/08, A47B91/02, E05D7/12, F25D23/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | Haushaltsgerät mit einem Türlagerwinkel | [2010/30] | English: | Domestic appliance with a door bearing bracket | [2014/01] | French: | Appareil ménager avec un support d'angle de porte | [2010/30] |
Former [2010/30] | domestic appliance with a door bearing bracket | Examination procedure | 28.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 31.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 20.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03740133.8 / EP1506342 | EP06100714.2 / EP1657389 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030740133) is 30.03.2005 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 31.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 31.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2003 | CY | 09.04.2014 | CZ | 09.04.2014 | DK | 09.04.2014 | EE | 09.04.2014 | FI | 09.04.2014 | MC | 09.04.2014 | NL | 09.04.2014 | RO | 09.04.2014 | SE | 09.04.2014 | SI | 09.04.2014 | SK | 09.04.2014 | TR | 09.04.2014 | AT | 13.05.2014 | IE | 13.05.2014 | LU | 13.05.2014 | BE | 31.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | BG | 09.07.2014 | GR | 10.07.2014 | PT | 11.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 13.05.2003 | |
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
AT | 13.05.2014 | ||
IE | 13.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CY | 09.04.2014 | |
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
AT | 13.05.2014 | ||
IE | 13.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
AT | 13.05.2014 | ||
IE | 13.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
IE | 13.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
IE | 13.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | DK | 09.04.2014 | |
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | DK | 09.04.2014 | |
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | FI | 09.04.2014 | |
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 09.04.2014 | |
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 09.04.2014 | |
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BG | 09.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0933161 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US5215367 (MONTUORO LOUIS D [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * figure - *; | [A]DE8703150U (BOSCH-SIEMENS HAUSGERÄTE GMBH) [A] 1-6 * figure - *; | [A]DE3818996 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 43; figure - * | Examination | KR20000045677 | by applicant | DE9206086U |