EP2202315 - Modified vaccinia ankara virus variant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bavarian Nordic A/S Bøgeskovvej 9 3490 Kvistgaard / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states Bavarian Nordic A/S Bögeskovvej 9 3490 Kvistgaard / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chaplin, Paul Bürgerstrasse 9 81925 München / DE | 02 /
Howley, Paul 9 Sing Cressent Berwick, VIC 3806 / AU | 03 /
Meisinger-Henschel, Christine Franz-Schuster-Strasse 23A 82061 Neuried / DE | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
Chaplin, Paul Bürgerstrasse 9 81925 München / DE | ||
02 /
Howley, Paul 60 Rose Avenue Glen Waverly, Victoria 3150 / AU | |||
03 /
Meisinger-Henschel, Christine Kreuzackerweg 1 82061 Neuried / DE | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10158051.2 | 22.11.2001 | [2010/26] | Priority number, date | DK20000001764 | 23.11.2000 Original published format: DK 200001764 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2202315 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/863, C12N15/39, C12N7/04, C12N5/10, A61K39/285, A61K48/00 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,NO,US);
A61K39/275 (NO);
C12N7/04 (KR);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/285 (EP,NO,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,NO,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP,NO,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,NO,US);
A61K2039/5254 (EP,NO,US);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,NO,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,NO,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,NO,US);
C12N2710/24121 (EP,NO,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2010/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Variante des modifizierten vaccinia ankara Virus | [2010/26] | English: | Modified vaccinia ankara virus variant | [2010/26] | French: | Variant modifié du virus de la vaccine ankara | [2010/26] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 29.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 23.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 02.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/06] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01991753.3 / EP1335987 | EP05017694.0 / EP1598425 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010991753) is 17.02.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9702355 (GSF FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM UMWELT [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,15 * page 4, line 1 - line 21 * * page 8, paragraphs 4,5 * * figure 1 * [I] 6,17; | [A]US5789245 (DUBENSKY JR THOMAS W [US], et al) [A] 1-17* column 75, line 61 - column 76, line 31 *; | [XI]WO9907869 (UNIV FLORIDA [US], et al) [X] 1-5,15 * the whole document * [I] 6,17; | [XI] - CARROLL M W ET AL, "Host Range and Cytopathogenicity of the Highly Attenuated MVA Strain of Vaccinia Virus: Propagation and Generation of Recombinant Viruses in a Nonhuman Mammalian Cell Line", VIROLOGY, (19971124), vol. 238, no. 2, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 198 - 211, XP004460124 [X] 1,15 * the whole document * [I] 6,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1997.8845 | [XI] - SUTTER G ET AL, "NONREPLICATING VACCINIA VECTOR EFFICIENTLY EXPRESSES RECOMBINANT GENES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, (19921101), vol. 89, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 10847 - 10851, XP001036843 [X] 1-5,15 * the whole document * [I] 6,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.22.10847 | by applicant | US5185146 | WO0168820 | - MAYR, A. ET AL., INFECTION, (1975), vol. 3, pages 6 - 14 | - MEYER, H. ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1991), vol. 72, pages 1031 - 1038 | - MAYR, A. AND DANNEN K., DEV. BIOL. STAND., (1978), vol. 41, pages 225 - 234 | - MAYR, ZBL. BAKT. HYG. I, A BT. ORG. B, (1987), vol. 167, pages 375 - 390 | - STICKL ET AL., DTSCH. MED. WSCHR., (1974), vol. 99, pages 2386 - 2392 | - SUTTER, G. ET AL., VACCINE, (1994), vol. 12, pages 1032 - 1040 | - BLANCHARD ET AL., J GEN VIROL, (1998), vol. 79, pages 1159 - 1167 | - CARROLL; MOSS, VIROLOGY, (1997), vol. 238, pages 198 - 211 | - AMBROSINI ET AL., J NEUROSCI RES, (1999), vol. 55, no. 5, page 569 | - BOUKAMP ET AL., J CELL BIOL, (1988), vol. 105, no. 3, pages 761 - 771 | - BOUKAMP ET AL., J CELL BIOL, (1988), vol. 106, no. 3, pages 761 - 771 | - SCHNEIDER ET AL., NAT. MED., (1998), vol. 4, pages 397 - 402 | - THOMSON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 160, page 1717 | - STICKL, H. ET AL., DTSCH. MED. WSCHR., (1974), vol. 99, pages 2386 - 2392 | - KAERBER, G., ARCH. EXP. PATHOL. PHARMAKOL., (1931), vol. 162, page 480 | - THOMSON, J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, page 1717 | - THOMSON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, page 1717 | - ROSENWIRTH, B ET AL., J VIROL, (2000), vol. 74, page 170411 | - ANKARA. NAT. MED., vol. 4, pages 397 - 402 | - THOMSON ET AL., "Delivery of multiple CD8 cytotoxic T cell epitopes by DNA vaccination", J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, page 1717 | WO1996EP02926 | WO2001EP02703 |