EP2375707 - Method and Human-to-Machine Interface apparatus for managing contact data with multiple labels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd. No. 6, Bau Chiang Road Hsin-Tien 231 Taipei / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd. No. 6, Bau Chiang Road Hsin-Tien Taipei 231 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Wei-Ting Giga-Byte technology co., Ltd. No. 6 Bau Chiang Road 231, Hsin Tien, Taipei County / TW | 02 /
Lin, Guei-Syuan Giga-Byte Technology No.6 Bau Chiang Road 231, Hsin Tien, Taipei County / TW | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Schwerbrock, Florian, et al Hagenauer Strasse 1 10435 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Schwerbrock, Florian, et al Danziger Strasse 35a 20099 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10158188.2 | 29.03.2010 | [2011/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2375707 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/2745, G06F3/048 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
H04M1/2745 (EP,US);
G06F16/2428 (EP);
H04M1/27453 (EP);
H04M1/27467 (EP,US);
H04M1/2757 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Mensch-Maschine-Schnittstelle-Vorrichtung zur Verwaltung von Kontaktdaten mit mehreren Kennzeichen | [2011/41] | English: | Method and Human-to-Machine Interface apparatus for managing contact data with multiple labels | [2011/41] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'interface utilisateur pour administrer des données de contact avec plusieurs étiquettes | [2011/41] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/43] | 29.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007042800 (TANI MINAKO [JP]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0046] - [0116] - [0137] - [0151]; figures 1-11, 15-17 *; | [I]US2009215486 (BATNI RAMACHENDRA P [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0024] - [0054]; figures 1-11 * |