EP2204340 - Portable tank apparatus and method of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clark, Glenn 45 Horobin Fallriver NS B2T 1E6 / CA | For all designated states Morrell, Colin 2086 Maynard Street Halifax NS B2K 3T4 / CA | [2010/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Fabris, Stefano, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Fabris, Stefano, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | Application number, filing date | 10158196.5 | 07.02.2006 | [2010/27] | Priority number, date | US20050052683 | 07.02.2005 Original published format: US 52683 | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2204340 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2204340 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/12, B65D88/06, B01D21/02, C02F1/00 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
B65D88/522 (EP,US);
B01D21/0003 (EP,US);
B01D21/02 (EP,US);
B65D88/08 (EP,US);
B65D90/024 (EP,US);
B65D90/14 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49893 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Extension states | AL | 02.05.2011 | BA | 02.05.2011 | HR | 02.05.2011 | MK | 02.05.2011 | YU | 02.05.2011 | Title | German: | Tragbarer Behälter und Verwendungsverfahren dafür | [2010/27] | English: | Portable tank apparatus and method of use | [2010/27] | French: | Appareil de réservoir portable et son procédé d'utilisation | [2010/27] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 16.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/44] | 06.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06705117.7 / EP1866217 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060705117) is 29.09.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.10.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 22.10.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.10.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 16.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.03.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2010 | 28.02.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0741211 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [X] 1-6,10,12,14,15 * page 4, line 39 - page 5, line 37 * * figures 1-11 *; | [X]FR2839334 (DESJOYAUX PIERRE L [FR], et al) [X] 1-6,10,12,14,15 * page 5, line 17 - page 9, line 23 * * figures 1-12 *; | [I]FR2606292 (COLSON FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [I] 1-5,7,10,12-14 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 3 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]DE19961560 (UNTERHOLZNER BERND [DE], et al) [A] 1,7,13,14 * column 3, lines 2-5 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US6328890 (THIBAULT RONALD M [US]) [A] 1,11 * column 1, lines 53-67 * * column 3, lines 44-58 * * column 7, lines 54-65 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]AU591233B (PETER HUGH TODD) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * figure 2 *; | [A]DE20001257U (RICHTER FRANZ WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE2847145 (STETTER GMBH) [A] 8,9 * figures 1, 2 * |