Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8869874 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2014 | B2 | US2013126119 | 23.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213678986 | 16.11.2012 | WO2007JP74590 | 14.12.2007 | ZA200610521 | 14.12.2006 | US44817209 | 11.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8336604 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2012 | B2 | US2010021755 | 28.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007JP74590 | 14.12.2007 | ZA200610521 | 14.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101280173B | Global Dossier | 28.06.2013 | B1 | KR20090095589 | 09.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007JP74590 | 14.12.2007 | ZA200610521 | 14.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5057312B | Global Dossier | 24.10.2012 | B2 | JP2010512247 | 22.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007JP74590 | 14.12.2007 | ZA200610521 | 14.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2228153 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2012 | B1 | EP2228153 | 15.12.2010 | A3 | EP2228153 | 15.09.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ZA200610521 | 14.12.2006 | EP07859915 | 14.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2125269 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2012 | B1 | EP2125269 | 02.12.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007JP74590 | 14.12.2007 | ZA200610521 | 14.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2202015 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ZA200610521 | 14.12.2006 | EP07859915 | 14.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101583445B | 26.12.2012 | B | CN101583445 | 18.11.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007JP74590 | 14.12.2007 | ZA200610521 | 14.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2390372T | 12.11.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007JP74590 | 14.12.2007 | ZA200610521 | 14.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200904155 | 23.02.2011 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2007JP74590 | 14.12.2007 | ZA200610521 | 14.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008072787 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A3 | WO2008072787 | 19.06.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ZA200610521 | 14.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE544546T | 15.02.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ZA200610521 | 14.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY154390 | 15.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | ZA200610521 | 14.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI430856B | 21.03.2014 | B | TW200909098 | 01.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | ZA200610521 | 14.12.2006 | Type | Earlier application | EP2125269 |