EP2202015 - Apparatus for manufacturing a multi-channel copper tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTA Technology (Proprietary) Limited 36 Hospital Street Cleveland Johannesburg Gauteng 2094 / ZA | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Siegert, Georg Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Siegert, Georg Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10158351.6 | 14.12.2007 | [2010/26] | Priority number, date | ZA20060010521 | 14.12.2006 Original published format: ZA 200610521 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2202015 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/00, B22D11/04, B22D11/045, B22D11/055, B22D11/12, F28F1/02, F28F21/08 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
B21C1/24 (EP,US);
B22D11/00 (KR);
B22C9/08 (US);
B21C1/16 (KR);
B21C37/151 (EP,US);
B22D11/004 (EP,US);
B22D11/006 (EP,US);
B22D11/04 (KR);
B22D11/0406 (EP,US);
B22D11/045 (EP,US);
B22D11/055 (EP,KR,US);
B22D11/1206 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Mehrkanalkupferrohres | [2010/26] | English: | Apparatus for manufacturing a multi-channel copper tube | [2010/26] | French: | Dispositif de fabrication de tuyeau de canaux multiples en cuivre | [2010/26] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/29] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07859915.6 / EP2125269 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070859915) is 30.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2034214 (TIMEX CORP) [X] 1,2* the whole document *; | [X]US4295516 (WILSON ROBERT) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0468299 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US5279353 (NIELSEN SR WILLIAM D [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0857529 (LE BRONZE IND S A [FR], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002125004 (KRAFT FRANK F [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004188056 (HAURI ROLAND [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * |