EP2200042 - Recording and Reproducing Apparatus, File Accessing Method, AV Data Managing Method, and Server [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIYAMA, Jiro 2-31-21-206 Maiharanishi Funabashi-shi Chiba 274-0825 / JP | 02 /
KIZUKI, Hideaki 435-1-7-1405, Konakadai-cho, Inage-ku, Chiba-shi Chiba Chiba 263-0044 / JP | 03 /
OHIZUMI, Katsushi 2-24-7-A-123, Honda-cho Midori-ku, Chiba-shi Chiba Chiba 266-0005 / JP | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Treeby, Philip David William R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10158487.8 | 22.07.2004 | [2010/25] | Priority number, date | JP20030346217 | 03.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003346217 | JP20030398358 | 28.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003398358 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2200042 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2200042 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, G11B27/32, G11B20/10 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
G06F9/505 (EP,US);
G06F12/14 (KR);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G06F9/5044 (EP,US);
G06F9/5055 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00173 (EP,US);
G11B20/00695 (EP,US);
G11B20/00702 (EP,US);
G11B20/00869 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10537 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10953 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/25] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabevorrichtung, Datenzugriffsverfahren, Verfahren zur Verwaltung von AV-Daten und Server | [2010/25] | English: | Recording and Reproducing Apparatus, File Accessing Method, AV Data Managing Method, and Server | [2010/25] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction, procédé d'accès aux fichiers, procédé de gestion de données AV et serveur | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 04.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/39] | 23.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04770865.6 / EP1679603 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040770865) is 27.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1158799 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2001052028 (ROBERTS DALE TYSON [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0038] - [0040]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1198132 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0056] - [0072] * * paragraphs [0160] - [0181] * * figures 1,30-41 *; | [X]EP1309205 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1308956 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0038]; figures 1,7 *; | [XP]WO03096175 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [XP] 1 * page 8, lines 21-27 * * page 12, line 7 - page 13, line 25 * * figures 1,2,5A,5B *; | [XP]WO2004030356 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 1 * abstract *; | [E]WO2005050528 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [E] 1 * the whole document *; | EP1553769 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0032] - [0146]; figures 1-29 *; | [AP] - BLU-RAY DISC FOUNDERS, "White paper Blu-Ray Disc Format : 2.B Audio Visual Application format specifications for BD-ROM", INTERNET CITATION, (20040831), URL: http://www.blu-raydisc.com/assets/downloadablefile/2b_bdrom_audiovisu alapplication-12841.pdf, (20050123), XP002315435 [AP] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | - KOPETZKY T ET AL, "Visual preview for link traversal on the World Wide Web", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990517), vol. 31, no. 11-16, doi:10.1016/S1389-1286(99)00050-X, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 1525 - 1532, XP004304571 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1286(99)00050-X | by applicant | JP2002157859 | JP2003223235 |