27.11.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] |
02.01.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
18.12.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
11.12.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.12.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.12.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.10.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.10.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.05.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.06.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.04.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.02.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.01.2012 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
27.01.2012 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
27.01.2012 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
26.01.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.11.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.07.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2011 |
First examination report |
|
22.03.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.02.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
01.02.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.06.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|