Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016145337 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562131669 | 11.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014130979 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361768618 | 25.02.2013 | US201361865704 | 14.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014121285 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2015 | A3 | WO2014121285 | 07.08.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361760238 | 04.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014105880 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261746329 | 27.12.2012 | US201361757905 | 29.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013126841 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261658522 | 12.06.2012 | US201261650747 | 23.05.2012 | US201261601980 | 22.02.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013043293 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526179 | 22.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013028761 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526186 | 22.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013028735 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526196 | 22.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013028725 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526171 | 22.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013028529 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161525244 | 19.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012154931 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012027330 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011140332 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161450745 | 09.03.2011 | US33163010 | 05.05.2010 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US34941510 | 28.05.2010 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010105102 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16897109 | 14.04.2009 | US23846209 | 31.08.2009 | US21817009 | 18.06.2009 | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010105056 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | US31040710 | 04.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010105054 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | US31040710 | 04.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010017451 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2010 | A3 | WO2010017451 | 11.02.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US8698608 | 07.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009036373 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2009 | A3 | WO2009036373 | 19.03.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US97266307 | 14.09.2007 | US7596508 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007092894 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2008 | A3 | WO2007092894 | 16.08.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US55006906 | 17.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021405523 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261746329 | 27.12.2012 | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US202117222467 | 05.04.2021 | US201514655361 | 25.06.2015 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201815909482 | 01.03.2018 | US201361757905 | 29.01.2013 | WO2013US77646 | 24.12.2013 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020022247 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361760238 | 04.02.2013 | US201514763989 | 28.07.2015 | WO2014US14720 | 04.02.2014 | US201916576458 | 19.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019336657 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526186 | 22.08.2011 | US201213591837 | 22.08.2012 | US201916502696 | 03.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019171098 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414238364 | 26.09.2014 | US201161526171 | 22.08.2011 | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201414496412 | 25.09.2014 | WO2012US51801 | 22.08.2012 | US201916273013 | 11.02.2019 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018321583 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816040385 | 19.07.2018 | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | WO2012US51816 | 22.08.2012 | US201161526196 | 22.08.2011 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201414496412 | 25.09.2014 | US201414238503 | 09.06.2014 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018211813 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201414238271 | 28.04.2014 | US201815933121 | 22.03.2018 | WO2012US51381 | 17.08.2012 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201414496412 | 25.09.2014 | US201161525244 | 19.08.2011 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018090295 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414238364 | 26.09.2014 | US201161526171 | 22.08.2011 | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201414496412 | 25.09.2014 | WO2012US51801 | 22.08.2012 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US201715826445 | 29.11.2017 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017303383 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414571533 | 16.12.2014 | US201562117574 | 18.02.2015 | US201414496412 | 25.09.2014 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US201361916615 | 16.12.2013 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201615047553 | 18.02.2016 | US201715623733 | 15.06.2017 | WO2016US22058 | 11.03.2016 | US201562131669 | 11.03.2015 | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9795719 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2017 | B2 | US2016114083 | 28.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US55006906 | 17.10.2006 | US201514985825 | 31.12.2015 | US201113041525 | 07.03.2011 | US31765201 | 06.09.2001 | US29038901 | 11.05.2001 | US201213596236 | 28.08.2012 | US14491902 | 13.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016004152 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361768618 | 25.02.2013 | US201361865704 | 14.08.2013 | US201414768899 | 25.02.2014 | WO2014US18147 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015366044 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361760238 | 04.02.2013 | WO2014US14720 | 04.02.2014 | US201414763989 | 04.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9808344 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2017 | B2 | US2015359636 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261661892 | 20.06.2012 | WO2012US51690 | 21.08.2012 | US201313922787 | 20.06.2013 | US201161526179 | 22.08.2011 | US201514833402 | 24.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015351892 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261746329 | 27.12.2012 | US201361757905 | 29.01.2013 | WO2013US77646 | 24.12.2013 | US201314655361 | 24.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9799488 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2017 | B2 | US2015294838 | 15.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414571533 | 16.12.2014 | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201414496412 | 25.09.2014 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US201361916615 | 16.12.2013 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015125510 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201214238868 | 22.08.2012 | US201161526186 | 22.08.2011 | WO2012US51868 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015038899 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201214238503 | 22.08.2012 | WO2012US51816 | 22.08.2012 | US201161526196 | 22.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015024020 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526171 | 22.08.2011 | WO2012US51801 | 22.08.2012 | US201214238364 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014236295 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US51690 | 21.08.2012 | US201214238752 | 21.08.2012 | US201161526179 | 22.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014236286 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201214238271 | 17.08.2012 | WO2012US51381 | 17.08.2012 | US201161525244 | 19.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014074159 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16897109 | 14.04.2009 | US23846209 | 31.08.2009 | US21817009 | 18.06.2009 | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201314074869 | 08.11.2013 | WO2012US37270 | 10.05.2012 | US72247310 | 11.03.2010 | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014021343 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2014 | A1 | US8629393 | 14.01.2014 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201313834484 | 15.03.2013 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9114195 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2015 | B2 | US2013282136 | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261661892 | 20.06.2012 | WO2012US51690 | 21.08.2012 | US201313922787 | 20.06.2013 | US201161526179 | 22.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013138213 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US53735309 | 07.08.2009 | US64306309 | 21.12.2009 | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US31765201 | 06.09.2001 | US29038901 | 11.05.2001 | US201313746795 | 22.01.2013 | US8698608 | 07.08.2008 | US14491902 | 13.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9005696 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2015 | B2 | US2013138212 | 30.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US53735309 | 07.08.2009 | US201313746456 | 22.01.2013 | US8698608 | 07.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9226998 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2016 | B2 | US2012321707 | 20.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US55006906 | 17.10.2006 | US201113041525 | 07.03.2011 | US31765201 | 06.09.2001 | US29038901 | 11.05.2001 | US201213596236 | 28.08.2012 | US14491902 | 13.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8847148 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2014 | B2 | US2012045615 | 23.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9144627 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2015 | B2 | US2011300599 | 08.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21001808 | 12.09.2008 | US16897109 | 14.04.2009 | US23846209 | 31.08.2009 | US21817009 | 18.06.2009 | US97266307 | 14.09.2007 | US72247310 | 11.03.2010 | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | US72247110 | 11.03.2010 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US37625510 | 23.08.2010 | US201113101757 | 05.05.2011 | US201161450745 | 09.03.2011 | US72211410 | 11.03.2010 | US33163010 | 05.05.2010 | US72212610 | 11.03.2010 | US7596508 | 26.06.2008 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US34941510 | 28.05.2010 | US31040710 | 04.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8252418 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2012 | B2 | US2011160845 | 30.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US55006906 | 17.10.2006 | US201113041525 | 07.03.2011 | US31765201 | 06.09.2001 | US29038901 | 11.05.2001 | US14491902 | 13.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8889169 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2014 | B2 | US2011029068 | 03.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21001808 | 12.09.2008 | US97266307 | 14.09.2007 | US7596508 | 26.06.2008 | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US55006906 | 17.10.2006 | US85116110 | 05.08.2010 | US31765201 | 06.09.2001 | US29038901 | 11.05.2001 | US14491902 | 13.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010234948 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16897109 | 14.04.2009 | US23846209 | 31.08.2009 | US21817009 | 18.06.2009 | US72247310 | 11.03.2010 | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010227523 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21001808 | 12.09.2008 | US16897109 | 14.04.2009 | US23846209 | 31.08.2009 | US21817009 | 18.06.2009 | US97266307 | 14.09.2007 | US7596508 | 26.06.2008 | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | US72247110 | 11.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8377460 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2013 | B2 | US2010226958 | 09.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21001808 | 12.09.2008 | US97266307 | 14.09.2007 | US72211410 | 11.03.2010 | US7596508 | 26.06.2008 | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | US31040710 | 04.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8367092 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2013 | B2 | US2010226897 | 09.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21001808 | 12.09.2008 | US97266307 | 14.09.2007 | US72212610 | 11.03.2010 | US7596508 | 26.06.2008 | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | US31040710 | 04.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8187662 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2012 | B2 | US2010098833 | 22.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US31765201 | 06.09.2001 | US29038901 | 11.05.2001 | US64304709 | 21.12.2009 | US14491902 | 13.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010098740 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64306309 | 21.12.2009 | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US31765201 | 06.09.2001 | US29038901 | 11.05.2001 | US14491902 | 13.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010036502 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US53735309 | 07.08.2009 | US8698608 | 07.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009074834 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21001808 | 12.09.2008 | US97266307 | 14.09.2007 | US7596508 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7923055 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2011 | B2 | US2007087034 | 19.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US55006906 | 17.10.2006 | US31765201 | 06.09.2001 | US29038901 | 11.05.2001 | US14491902 | 13.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7666462 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2010 | B2 | US2006204534 | 14.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US31765201 | 06.09.2001 | US29038901 | 11.05.2001 | US14491902 | 13.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11698582 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2023 | B2 | US2019137868 | 09.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | WO2012US51690 | 21.08.2012 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201414496412 | 25.09.2014 | US201161526179 | 22.08.2011 | US201916239272 | 03.01.2019 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201414238752 | 28.04.2014 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11199769 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2021 | B2 | US2018299771 | 18.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361760238 | 04.02.2013 | WO2014US14720 | 04.02.2014 | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201762519905 | 15.06.2017 | US201816008585 | 14.06.2018 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201414496412 | 25.09.2014 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11048162 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2021 | B2 | US2020249565 | 06.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201414496412 | 25.09.2014 | US201916564743 | 09.09.2019 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10971324 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2021 | B2 | US2018190468 | 05.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261746329 | 27.12.2012 | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201514655361 | 25.06.2015 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201414496412 | 25.09.2014 | US201815909482 | 01.03.2018 | US201361757905 | 29.01.2013 | WO2013US77646 | 24.12.2013 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10858732 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2020 | B2 | US2019185991 | 20.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261658522 | 12.06.2012 | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201916273037 | 11.02.2019 | US201261650747 | 23.05.2012 | WO2013US27512 | 22.02.2013 | US201261601980 | 22.02.2012 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201414466242 | 22.08.2014 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10825685 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2020 | B2 | US2019279872 | 12.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414571533 | 16.12.2014 | US201916246634 | 14.01.2019 | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201414496412 | 25.09.2014 | US201562117574 | 18.02.2015 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US201361916615 | 16.12.2013 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201615047553 | 18.02.2016 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10670960 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2020 | B2 | US2018292745 | 11.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816008573 | 14.06.2018 | US201762519389 | 14.06.2017 | US201261658522 | 12.06.2012 | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201261650747 | 23.05.2012 | WO2013US27512 | 22.02.2013 | US201261601980 | 22.02.2012 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201414466242 | 22.08.2014 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10556042 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2020 | B2 | US2017290960 | 12.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526186 | 22.08.2011 | US201414238271 | 28.04.2014 | US201414238868 | 21.11.2014 | WO2012US51381 | 17.08.2012 | US201715624381 | 15.06.2017 | WO2012US51868 | 22.08.2012 | US201161525244 | 19.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10409155 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2019 | B2 | US2015213996 | 30.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201414496412 | 25.09.2014 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10342900 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2019 | B2 | US2013218264 | 22.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526186 | 22.08.2011 | US201213591837 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10209617 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2019 | B2 | US2017123309 | 04.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514768899 | 19.08.2015 | US201361768618 | 25.02.2013 | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201715403964 | 11.01.2017 | US201361865704 | 14.08.2013 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201414496412 | 25.09.2014 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | WO2014US18147 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10202684 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2019 | B2 | US2014363678 | 11.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261658522 | 12.06.2012 | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201261650747 | 23.05.2012 | WO2013US27512 | 22.02.2013 | US201261601980 | 22.02.2012 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201414466242 | 22.08.2014 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10181402 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2019 | B2 | US2016172197 | 16.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414571533 | 16.12.2014 | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US201414496412 | 25.09.2014 | US201562117574 | 18.02.2015 | US201113215514 | 23.08.2011 | US201361916615 | 16.12.2013 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201615047553 | 18.02.2016 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102542804B | Global Dossier | 14.06.2023 | B1 | KR20170127347 | 21.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562131669 | 11.03.2015 | WO2016US22058 | 11.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6752490B | Global Dossier | 09.09.2020 | B2 | JP2019117400 | 18.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361768618 | 25.02.2013 | US201361865704 | 14.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6826535B | Global Dossier | 03.02.2021 | B2 | JP2018514939 | 07.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562131669 | 11.03.2015 | WO2016US22058 | 11.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6388975B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2018 | B2 | JP2017136381 | 10.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161525244 | 19.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016509263 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361768618 | 25.02.2013 | US201361865704 | 14.08.2013 | WO2014US18147 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6408490B | Global Dossier | 17.10.2018 | B2 | JP2016507133 | 07.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361760238 | 04.02.2013 | WO2014US14720 | 04.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6189297B | Global Dossier | 30.08.2017 | B2 | JP2014528776 | 30.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161526186 | 22.08.2011 | WO2012US51868 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6157469B | Global Dossier | 05.07.2017 | B2 | JP2014528775 | 30.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US51690 | 21.08.2012 | US201161526179 | 22.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6085604B | Global Dossier | 22.02.2017 | B2 | JP2014525816 | 02.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US51816 | 22.08.2012 | US201161526196 | 22.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014525813 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US51381 | 17.08.2012 | US201161525244 | 19.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6185469B | Global Dossier | 23.08.2017 | B2 | JP2014524473 | 22.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161526171 | 22.08.2011 | WO2012US51801 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6211986B | Global Dossier | 11.10.2017 | B2 | JP2014198247 | 23.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161526186 | 22.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5914464B | Global Dossier | 11.05.2016 | B2 | JP2013534835 | 09.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011US35349 | 05.05.2011 | US201161450745 | 09.03.2011 | US33163010 | 05.05.2010 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US34941510 | 28.05.2010 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5701783B | Global Dossier | 15.04.2015 | B2 | JP2012520150 | 06.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US27046 | 11.03.2010 | US16897109 | 14.04.2009 | US23846209 | 31.08.2009 | US21817009 | 18.06.2009 | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012520143 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US26984 | 11.03.2010 | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | US31040710 | 04.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5878374B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2016 | B2 | JP2012520142 | 06.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US26980 | 11.03.2010 | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | US31040710 | 04.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5878369B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2016 | B2 | JP2011530346 | 22.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US53108 | 07.08.2009 | US8698608 | 07.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5448458B | Global Dossier | 19.03.2014 | B2 | JP2009525787 | 16.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US55006906 | 17.10.2006 | WO2007US61787 | 07.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4617060B | Global Dossier | 19.01.2011 | B2 | JP2004532081 | 21.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0215236 | 13.05.2002 | US31765201 | 06.09.2001 | US29038901 | 11.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL254182 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2020 | B | Priority number | Date | US201161526186 | 22.08.2011 | WO2012US51868 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3268505 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2022 | B1 | EP3268505 | 14.11.2018 | A4 | EP3268505 | 17.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562131669 | 11.03.2015 | WO2016US22058 | 11.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2959502 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2016 | A4 | EP2959502 | 30.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361768618 | 25.02.2013 | US201361865704 | 14.08.2013 | WO2014US18147 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2952070 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2018 | B1 | EP2952070 | 12.10.2016 | A4 | EP2952070 | 09.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361760238 | 04.02.2013 | WO2014US14720 | 04.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2749150 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2020 | B1 | EP2749150 | 07.01.2015 | A4 | EP2749150 | 02.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US51690 | 21.08.2012 | US201161526179 | 22.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2747802 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2022 | B1 | EP2747802 | 27.05.2015 | A4 | EP2747802 | 02.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526186 | 22.08.2011 | WO2012US51868 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2747801 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2015 | A4 | EP2747801 | 02.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526171 | 22.08.2011 | WO2012US51801 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2747711 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2019 | B1 | EP2747711 | 19.08.2015 | A4 | EP2747711 | 02.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US51816 | 22.08.2012 | US201161526196 | 22.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2744449 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2017 | B1 | EP2744449 | 18.03.2015 | A4 | EP2744449 | 25.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US51381 | 17.08.2012 | US201161525244 | 19.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2608872 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2019 | B1 | EP2608872 | 03.08.2016 | A4 | EP2608872 | 03.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | WO2011US48754 | 23.08.2011 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2567012 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2015 | B1 | EP2567012 | 27.08.2014 | A4 | EP2567012 | 13.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US35349 | 05.05.2011 | US201161450745 | 09.03.2011 | US33163010 | 05.05.2010 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US34941510 | 28.05.2010 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2405891 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2019 | B1 | EP2405891 | 30.04.2014 | A4 | EP2405891 | 18.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US26980 | 11.03.2010 | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | US31040710 | 04.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2405858 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2014 | A4 | EP2405858 | 18.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US27046 | 11.03.2010 | US16897109 | 14.04.2009 | US23846209 | 31.08.2009 | US21817009 | 18.06.2009 | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2326356 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2017 | B1 | EP2326356 | 04.12.2013 | A4 | EP2326356 | 01.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US53108 | 07.08.2009 | US8698608 | 07.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1986791 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2017 | B9 | EP1986791 | 28.10.2015 | B1 | EP1986791 | 28.09.2011 | A4 | EP1986791 | 05.11.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US55006906 | 17.10.2006 | WO2007US61787 | 07.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1393601 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2010 | B1 | EP1393601 | 21.03.2007 | A4 | EP1393601 | 03.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0215236 | 13.05.2002 | US31765201 | 06.09.2001 | US29038901 | 11.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106164326B | Global Dossier | 16.08.2019 | B | CN106164326 | 23.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562131669 | 11.03.2015 | WO2016US22058 | 11.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105378898 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361768618 | 25.02.2013 | US201361865704 | 14.08.2013 | WO2014US18147 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103180030B | Global Dossier | 12.04.2017 | B | CN103180030 | 26.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | WO2011US48754 | 23.08.2011 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102348795 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US26984 | 11.03.2010 | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | US31040710 | 04.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102348453B | Global Dossier | 16.11.2016 | B | CN102348453 | 08.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US26980 | 11.03.2010 | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | US31040710 | 04.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102348430B | Global Dossier | 01.09.2017 | B | CN102348430 | 08.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US27046 | 11.03.2010 | US16897109 | 14.04.2009 | US23846209 | 31.08.2009 | US21817009 | 18.06.2009 | US15911309 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3027990 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2021 | C | CA3027990 | 28.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526171 | 22.08.2011 | CA2845355 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2916068 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2020 | C | CA2916068 | 16.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US55006906 | 17.10.2006 | CA2638020 | 07.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2845762 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2019 | C | CA2845762 | 28.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526186 | 22.08.2011 | WO2012US51868 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2845355 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2019 | C | CA2845355 | 28.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526171 | 22.08.2011 | WO2012US51801 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2811750 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2018 | C | CA2811750 | 01.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | WO2011US48754 | 23.08.2011 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2638020 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2016 | C | CA2638020 | 16.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US55006906 | 17.10.2006 | WO2007US61787 | 07.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016204279B | Global Dossier | 03.08.2017 | B2 | AU2016204279 | 14.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2012298959 | 22.08.2012 | US201161526171 | 22.08.2011 | AU2016204279 | 23.06.2016 | WO2012US51801 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012298959 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526171 | 22.08.2011 | WO2012US51801 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012298912B | Global Dossier | 07.07.2016 | B2 | AU2012298912 | 06.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526186 | 22.08.2011 | WO2012US51868 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011293560B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2015 | B2 | AU2011293560 | 11.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | WO2011US48754 | 23.08.2011 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2210626 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2015 | B1 | EP2210626 | 28.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02769731 | 13.05.2002 | US31765201 | 06.09.2001 | US29038901 | 11.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60237813D1 | 11.11.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0215236 | 13.05.2002 | US31765201 | 06.09.2001 | US29038901 | 11.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2560865T | 23.02.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US55006906 | 17.10.2006 | WO2007US61787 | 07.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1198470 | 08.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161526171 | 22.08.2011 | WO2012US51801 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1218828 | 10.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361760238 | 04.02.2013 | WO2014US14720 | 04.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL193283 | 31.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US34948306 | 07.02.2006 | US55006906 | 17.10.2006 | WO2007US61787 | 07.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2579749 | 10.04.2016 | C2 | RU2013112933 | 27.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161484421 | 10.05.2011 | WO2011US48754 | 23.08.2011 | US201161473359 | 08.04.2011 | US37622510 | 23.08.2010 | US201161490675 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2014110963 | 27.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161526186 | 22.08.2011 | WO2012US51868 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2642979 | 29.01.2018 | C2 | RU2014111053 | 27.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161526171 | 22.08.2011 | WO2012US51801 | 22.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2648961 | 28.03.2018 | C2 | RU2014138019 | 20.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261658522 | 12.06.2012 | US201261650747 | 23.05.2012 | US201261601980 | 22.02.2012 | WO2013US27512 | 22.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2653581 | 15.05.2018 | C2 | RU2015137676 | 10.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361760238 | 04.02.2013 | WO2014US14720 | 04.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201707086R | 28.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562131669 | 11.03.2015 | WO2016US22058 | 11.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7105199 | 12.09.2006 | B2 | US2002188324 | 12.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31765201 | 06.09.2001 | US29038901 | 11.05.2001 | US14491902 | 13.05.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02093988 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31765201 | 06.09.2001 | US29038901 | 11.05.2001 | Type | Earlier application | EP1393601 |