EP2239727 - Musical performance apparatus and program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | [2010/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamiya, Taishi YAMAHA Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Ascherl, Andreas, et al KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Ascherl, Andreas, et al Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Straße 9 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/41] | Kehl, Günther, et al Kehl & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10158620.4 | 31.03.2010 | [2010/41] | Priority number, date | JP20090093978 | 08.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009093978 | JP20090093979 | 08.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009093979 | JP20100056129 | 12.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010056129 | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2239727 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/00 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
G10H1/0025 (EP,US);
G10H2210/105 (EP,US);
G10H2210/125 (EP,US);
G10H2220/005 (EP,US);
G10H2240/135 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Musikalisches Aufführungssystem und Programm | [2010/41] | English: | Musical performance apparatus and program | [2010/41] | French: | Appareil et programme de performance musicale | [2010/41] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 29.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 29.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2008225200 (YAMAHA CORP) [A] 1,8 * figures 2, 4 * | [XAI] - Patrick1293, "How to make Popcorn in LMMS", (20080923), YouTube, URL: http://www.youtube.com/watch?v=pfQYJiLLH0k, (20100511), XP002583157 [X] 1,2,8 * time 0:25 - 2:30 * [A] 4-7,9 [I] 3 | [XAI] - Tobias Doerffel, "Making Music with Linux Multimedia Studio Music Builder", no. 61, (200512), Linux Magazine, URL: http://www.linux-magazine.com/w3/issue/61/Making_Music_with_Linux_Multimedia_Studio.pdf, (20100511), XP002582538 [X] 1,2,8 * section "First Steps"; page 59, column RHS * * figures 1, 2 * [A] 4-7,9 [I] 3 | [XPAI] - mobilephone2003, "How To Create A Song/Tune For Free With LMMS", (20090809), YouTube, URL: http://www.youtube.com/watch?v=AzT4X8vweaE&feature=related, (20100518), XP002583158 [XP] 1,2,8 * time 1:20 - 6:00 * [A] 4-7,9 [I] 3 | [XA] - "Sony Acid Pro 6 Audio & MIDI Loop Sequencer [Windows]", (200607), Sound On Sound, URL: http://www.soundonsound.com/sos/jul06/articles/sonyacid6.htm?print=yes, (20100518), XP002582539 [X] 1,8 * sections "Keeping You in Loop" and "Keeping Track o Your Loops"; page 1 - page 2; figures 1-3 * [A] 2-7,9 | [XA] - johnnyvtc, "VTC Sony Acid Pro 6 - Adding More Loops", (20061020), YouTube, URL: http://www.youtube.com/watch?v=J0f4qXHrFqE, (20100518), XP002583159 [X] 1,2,8 * time 0:00 - 2:00 and 2:20 - 4:15 * [A] 3-7,9 | by applicant | JP2008225200 | JPH07121163 |