EP2372500 - Computing arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone GmbH Ferdinand-Braun-Platz 1 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [2014/49] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Vodafone Holding GmbH Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, Thomas Weissenburgerstrasse 46 81667 München / DE | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Müller & Schubert Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 13 81667 München / DE | [2011/40] | Application number, filing date | 10158705.3 | 31.03.2010 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2372500 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/038 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rechenanordnung | [2011/40] | English: | Computing arrangement | [2011/40] | French: | Agencement de calcul | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 25.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.05.2016 | 30.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/43] | 31.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.06.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6359636 (SCHINDLER JEFFREY [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * figures 1, 11a, 11b * * column 3, line 31 - line 35 * * column 7, line 44 - column 8, line 18 * * column 9, line 24 - line 44 * * column 15, line 11 - line 65 * * column 19, line 12 - line 31 *; | [X]US2005078092 (CLAPPER EDWARD O [US]) [X] 1-3,8 * figure 1 ** paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] *; | [X]US2008044000 (CHANG CHI [TW]) [X] 1-3,8 * figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0027] * | Examination | WO2009122756 | EP2268052 |