EP2198856 - Process for preparing granular compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reckitt Benckiser Healthcare (UK) Limited 103-105 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dring, Richard James The Boots Company plc 1 Thane Road West Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG2 3AA / GB | 02 /
Edinborough, Nicholas, David The Boots Company plc 1 Thane Road West Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG2 3AA / GB | 03 /
Sherry, Robert, Arthur 18 Raeburn Drive Toton Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG9 6LF / GB | [2018/09] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
Dring, Richard James The Boots Company plc 1 Thane Road West Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG2 3AA / GB | ||
02 /
Edinborough, Nicholas, David The Boots Company plc 1 Thane Road West Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG2 3AA / GB | |||
03 /
Sherry, Robert, Arthur 18 Raeburn Drive Toton Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG9 6LF / GB | Representative(s) | O'Brien, Niall James, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [2018/09] |
Former [2010/25] | O'Brien, Niall James, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10158751.7 | 30.05.2002 | [2010/25] | Priority number, date | GB20010013841 | 07.06.2001 Original published format: GB 0113841 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2198856 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2198856 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, B01J2/20, B29C47/40 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
A61K9/2077 (EP,US);
A61K9/1682 (CZ);
A61K31/192 (CZ);
A61K45/06 (CZ);
A61K9/16 (CZ);
A61K9/1694 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
B01J2/20 (EP,CZ,US);
B29C48/40 (EP);
B29C48/41 (EP);
B29C48/57 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2018/09] |
Former [2010/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur herstellung körnigen zusammensetzungen | [2010/25] | English: | Process for preparing granular compositions | [2010/25] | French: | Procédés pour la preparation des compositions granulaires | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 22.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.07.2017 | 04.07.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02727770.6 / EP1392247 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020727770) is 05.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | DK | 28.02.2018 | ES | 28.02.2018 | FI | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | NL | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | SE | 28.02.2018 | GR | 29.05.2018 | LU | 30.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2019/17] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 30.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4578455 (PIPPER GUNTER [DE], et al); | [XY]EP0665009 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD [JP]); | [XY]WO9718839 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al); | [XY]US5667807 (HUERNER INGRID [DE], et al); | [A]DE19809242 (BASF AG [DE]); | [X]US5965161 (OSHLACK BENJAMIN [US], et al); | [A]DE19841244 (KNOLL AG [DE]); | [Y]US6150424 (BREITENBACH JOERG [DE], et al); | [XP]WO0141733 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB], et al); | [E]WO02098387 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB], et al) |