EP2256228 - Layered coating for erosion protection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2016/43] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nardi, Aaron T. 17 Concord Drive East Granby, CT 06026 / US | 02 /
Shi, Jun 302 Kinne Road Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | 03 /
Smith, Blair A. 45 Sweet Meadow Drive South Windsor, 06074 / US | [2017/41] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
Nardi, Aaron T. 17 Concord Drive East Granby, CT 06026 / US | ||
02 /
Shi, Jun 302 Kinne Road Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | |||
03 /
Smith, Blair A. 45 Sweet Meadow Drive South Windsor, 06074 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2011/34] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/48] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10158900.0 | 31.03.2010 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | US20090472871 | 27.05.2009 Original published format: US 472871 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2256228 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2256228 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2256228 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/12, C23C28/00, C23C28/04 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
C23C4/12 (EP,US);
C23C24/04 (EP,US);
C23C28/324 (EP,US);
C23C28/34 (EP,US);
C23C28/341 (EP,US);
C23C28/343 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24983 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] |
Former [2010/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Lagenbeschichtung zum Erosionsschutz | [2010/48] | English: | Layered coating for erosion protection | [2010/48] | French: | Couche stratifiée pour la protection contre l'érosion | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 04.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2010 | AT | 11.10.2017 | CY | 11.10.2017 | CZ | 11.10.2017 | DK | 11.10.2017 | EE | 11.10.2017 | ES | 11.10.2017 | FI | 11.10.2017 | HR | 11.10.2017 | IT | 11.10.2017 | LT | 11.10.2017 | LV | 11.10.2017 | MC | 11.10.2017 | MK | 11.10.2017 | NL | 11.10.2017 | PL | 11.10.2017 | PT | 11.10.2017 | RO | 11.10.2017 | SE | 11.10.2017 | SI | 11.10.2017 | SK | 11.10.2017 | SM | 11.10.2017 | TR | 11.10.2017 | BG | 11.01.2018 | NO | 11.01.2018 | GR | 12.01.2018 | IS | 11.02.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | IE | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | LU | 31.03.2018 | MT | 31.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 31.03.2010 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
MT | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
MT | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
MT | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 11.10.2017 | |
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 11.10.2017 | |
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 11.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0526670 (UNION CARBIDE COATINGS SERVICE [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,12,14 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 31 * * page 7, line 34 - line 57; table 2 * * claims 1-14 *; | [XI]DE102004032342 (FEDERAL MOGUL BURSCHEID GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-14 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 17; claims 1-4,9-14,16-17 * [I] 15; | [XI]EP1980645 (STEIN RALF [DE], et al) [X] 1-10,12-15 * page 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 8 * * page 3, paragraph 15 - page 4, paragraph 31 * * page 6, paragraph 52 - paragraph 56 * * page 7, paragraph 62 - paragraph 71 * * page 8, paragraph 77 - page 9, paragraph 87 * * claims 1-16 * [I] 11; | [XI] - UTSUMI ET AL, "Effect of a hard supra-thick interlayer on adhesion of DLC film prepared with PBIID process", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - B:BEAM INTERACTIONS WITH MATERIALS AND ATOMS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070401), vol. 257, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.NIMB.2007.01.127, ISSN 0168-583X, pages 706 - 709, XP022014801 [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 706, paragraph 1. Introduction - page 708; figure 3 * * page 709, column left * [I] 14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nimb.2007.01.127 | [A] - SHANOV V ET AL, "CVD diamond coating for erosion protection at elevated temperatures", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS ENGINEERING AND PERFORMANCE, ASM INTERNATIONAL, US, (200204), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1361/105994902770344303, pages 220 - 225, XP002607210 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1361/105994902770344303 |