EP2278860 - Intelligent control module and method for lighting lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanpower International Limited OMC Chambers, Road Town, P.O. Box 3152 Tortola / VG | For all designated states Hsu, Hsiu-Yu 3F, N[deg]. 472, Dongyang St., Beitou District Taipei City / TW | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tzeng, Jiun-Chau 4F, No. 23, Lane 811, Section 5 Jhongshan N. Road Taipei City / TW | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | ter Meer, Nicolaus Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | ter Meer, Nicolaus TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10159396.0 | 08.04.2010 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | TW19810025118 | 24.07.2009 Original published format: TW 098125118 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2278860 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
H05B47/165 (EP,US);
Y02B20/40 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Intelligentes Steuerungsmodul und Verfahren zum Beleuchten einer Lampe | [2011/04] | English: | Intelligent control module and method for lighting lamp | [2011/04] | French: | Module de commande intelligent et procédé pour lampe d'éclairage | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/18] | 10.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |