EP2261534 - Industrial transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2010/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Messink, Christoph / Vehnsweg 12a 46399, Bocholt / DE | [2012/14] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Messink, Christoph Vehnsweg 12a 46399, Bocholt / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/14] | Application number, filing date | 10159452.1 | 09.04.2010 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | DE20091025027 | 10.06.2009 Original published format: DE102009025027 | [2010/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2261534 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2261534 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/04, // F16H57/02 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
F16H57/031 (EP);
F16H57/0405 (EP);
F16H57/0413 (EP);
F16H57/021 (EP);
F16H57/0417 (EP);
F16H57/0495 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/50] | Title | German: | Industriegetriebe | [2010/50] | English: | Industrial transmission | [2010/50] | French: | Engrenage industriel | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 08.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2010 | CY | 04.04.2012 | CZ | 04.04.2012 | DK | 04.04.2012 | EE | 04.04.2012 | HR | 04.04.2012 | LT | 04.04.2012 | LV | 04.04.2012 | MK | 04.04.2012 | MT | 04.04.2012 | NL | 04.04.2012 | PL | 04.04.2012 | RO | 04.04.2012 | SE | 04.04.2012 | SI | 04.04.2012 | SK | 04.04.2012 | SM | 04.04.2012 | TR | 04.04.2012 | IE | 09.04.2012 | LU | 09.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | BG | 04.07.2012 | NO | 04.07.2012 | GR | 05.07.2012 | IS | 04.08.2012 | PT | 06.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
SM | 04.04.2012 | ||
TR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 09.04.2012 | ||
LU | 09.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
TR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 09.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 09.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MK | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 09.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 09.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 09.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 09.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | LT | 04.04.2012 | |
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 04.04.2012 | |
NO | 04.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1552866 (COAL INDUSTRY PATENTS LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE3606963 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [AD] 1 * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 19 * * figures 3-6 *; | [AD]US5072784 (STENLUND STIG [SE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0853225 (KTM KUEHLER GMBH [AT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0990820 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0018]; figure 1a *; | [AD]DE102006020801 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [AD] 1 * paragraphs [0091] , [0092] , [0117] - [0127] - [0132] * * figures 4d,5a,5b *; | [A]DE102006031280 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1,4-7* claim 1 * | by applicant | DE3606963 | US5072784 | DE10315684 | DE102004022863 | DE102006020801 | DE102007024512 |