EP2262188 - Method and apparatus for disseminating a data packet via multi-hop communication in a communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Change - classification | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | 10.03.2017 | Change - classification | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | 10.03.2017 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2017/15] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Menouar, Hamid "Les Oliviers" A 55, avenue de cannes 06160, Antibes / FR | 02 /
Mariyasagayam Nestor Appt. 009 Residence St. Exupery Carrefour Georges Pompidou 06560, Valbonne / FR | 03 /
Lenardi, Massimiliano "Les Grands Logis" D 390 Chemin des Ames du Purgatoire 06600, Antibes / FR | 04 /
Horita, Yuki Villa d'azur B161, 333 Avenue Pierre Semard 06560, Golfe Juan / FR | [2012/22] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Menouar, Hamid "Les Oliviers" A 55, avenue de cannes 06160, Antibes / FR | ||
02 /
Mariyasagayam Nestor Appt. 009 Residence St. Exupery Carrefour Georges 06560, Valbonne / FR | |||
03 /
Lenardi, Massimiliano "Les Grands Logis" D 390, Chemin des Ames du Purg 06600, Antibes / FR | |||
04 /
Horita, Yuki Villa d'azur B161, 333 Avenue Pierre Semard 06560, Golfe Juan / FR | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2017/15] |
Former [2012/44] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/50] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10159693.0 | 12.04.2010 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | EP20090162641 | 12.06.2009 Original published format: EP 09162641 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2262188 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2262188 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2262188 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W40/12 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
H04W40/026 (EP);
H04W40/06 (EP);
H04W40/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/50] | H04L12/56, H04W40/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2010/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verteilung eines Datenpaketes via Multihopkommunikation in einem Kommunikationsnetzwerk | [2010/50] | English: | Method and apparatus for disseminating a data packet via multi-hop communication in a communication network | [2010/50] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour diffuser un paquet de données via communication à sauts multiples dans un réseau de communication | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 09.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12190648.1 / EP2592869 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE Kapsch TrafficCom AG Am Europlatz 2 1120 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Weiser, Andreas Patentanwalt Kopfgasse 7 1130 Wien / AT | [2013/36] | 04.09.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.03.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M01) | 25.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.05.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.08.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.08.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.03.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.04.2010 | AT | 31.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | CY | 31.10.2012 | CZ | 31.10.2012 | DK | 31.10.2012 | EE | 31.10.2012 | FI | 31.10.2012 | HR | 31.10.2012 | LT | 31.10.2012 | LV | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | MK | 31.10.2012 | MT | 31.10.2012 | PL | 31.10.2012 | RO | 31.10.2012 | SE | 31.10.2012 | SI | 31.10.2012 | SK | 31.10.2012 | SM | 31.10.2012 | TR | 31.10.2012 | BG | 31.01.2013 | NO | 31.01.2013 | GR | 01.02.2013 | ES | 11.02.2013 | IS | 28.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | IE | 12.04.2013 | LU | 12.04.2013 | GB | 12.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
MK | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SM | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 12.04.2013 | ||
GB | 12.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SM | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 12.04.2013 | ||
GB | 12.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 12.04.2013 | ||
GB | 12.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 12.04.2013 | ||
GB | 12.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 12.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
NO | 31.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009018835 (NEC EUROPE LTD [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 3, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 4, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 8, paragraph 1 * | [A] - BERNSEN J ET AL, "Unicast routing protocols for vehicular ad hoc networks: A critical comparison and classification", PERVASIVE AND MOBILE COMPUTING, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1574-1192, (20090201), pages 1 - 18, (20080907), XP025883192 [A] 1-19 * page 2, paragraph 1.1 * * page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraphs 4,4.1.1 * * page 7, paragraph 4.1.2 * * page 10, paragraph 4.2.1 * * page 13, paragraph 4.2.5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pmcj.2008.09.001 | [A] - STEPHAN EICHLER ED - UMALI E M ET AL, "MDRP: A Content-aware Data Exchange Protocol for Mobile Ad Hoc Networks", WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, 2007. ISWCS 2007. 4TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20071001), ISBN 978-1-4244-0978-5, pages 742 - 746, XP031166868 [A] 1-19 * page 742, column 1, paragraph I * * page 743, column 1, paragraph B * * page 744, column 1, paragraph B * * page 745, column 1; figure 4 * * page 746, column 1, paragraph V * | by applicant | EP1788749 | - KARP, B.; KUNG, H.T., "Greedy Perimeter Stateless Routing for Wireless Networks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SIXTH ANNUAL ACM/IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE AN MOBILE COMPUTING AND NETWORKING, (200008), pages 243 - 254 |