EP2377730 - Airbag Module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Car Corporation 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [2011/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenberg, Johan Hermanslustvägen 4 44332, Lerum / SE | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2019/03] |
Former [2011/42] | Widahl, Jenny Marie Volvo Car Corporation 50094 Intellectual Property Dept 50094 - HBBVN-VAK 40531 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 10159845.6 | 14.04.2010 | [2011/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2377730 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2377730 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
B60R21/205 (EP);
B60R21/2176 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] |
Former [2011/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Airbagmodul | [2011/42] | English: | Airbag Module | [2011/42] | French: | Module d'airbag | [2011/42] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.04.2010 | AT | 16.01.2019 | CY | 16.01.2019 | CZ | 16.01.2019 | DK | 16.01.2019 | EE | 16.01.2019 | ES | 16.01.2019 | FI | 16.01.2019 | HR | 16.01.2019 | LT | 16.01.2019 | LV | 16.01.2019 | MC | 16.01.2019 | MK | 16.01.2019 | MT | 16.01.2019 | NL | 16.01.2019 | PL | 16.01.2019 | RO | 16.01.2019 | SE | 16.01.2019 | SI | 16.01.2019 | SK | 16.01.2019 | SM | 16.01.2019 | TR | 16.01.2019 | IE | 14.04.2019 | LU | 14.04.2019 | BG | 16.04.2019 | GB | 16.04.2019 | NO | 16.04.2019 | GR | 17.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | IS | 16.05.2019 | PT | 16.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.04.2010 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
MT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IE | 14.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GB | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.04.2010 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IE | 14.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GB | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IE | 14.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GB | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IE | 14.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GB | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GB | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GB | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 16.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007007753 (WILLIAMS JEFFREY D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] - [0042] - [0044] , [0049] , [0050] , [0058] - [0067] - [0071] - [0073] - [0075] * [I] 3; | [X]WO2008105694 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE], et al) [X] 1-5,9-13 * abstract * * page 8, lines 20-25 * * page 12, lines 9-14 * * page 14, lines 15-25 * * page 15, lines 16-20 ** page 16, lines 4-10 * |