blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2242149

EP2242149 - Connector for a multi-terminal connector device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.03.2015
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.04.2015  [2015/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plastimat GmbH
Stahlstrasse 1
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
[2010/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Jürgens, Hans-Georg
Kapellenstrasse 130
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
 [2010/42]
Representative(s)Thun, Clemens
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Karlstraße 7
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/42]Thun, Clemens
Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date10159864.714.04.2010
[2010/42]
Priority number, dateDE20092005591U14.04.2009         Original published format: DE 202009005591 U
[2010/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2242149
Date:20.10.2010
Language:DE
[2010/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2010
ClassificationIPC:H01R13/703, H01R13/52, H02G11/00, // H01R13/506, H01R13/58, H01R13/625
[2014/22]
CPC:
H02G11/00 (EP); H01R13/52 (EP); H01R13/703 (EP);
H01R13/506 (EP); H01R13/5804 (EP); H01R13/625 (EP)
Former IPC [2010/42]H01R13/703, H01R13/52
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/42]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Steckdose für eine mehrpolige Steckvorrichtung[2010/42]
English:Connector for a multi-terminal connector device[2010/42]
French:Prise pour un dispositif de raccordement multipolaire[2010/42]
Examination procedure20.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/22]
02.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/15]
18.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2015/15]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2037545  (PLASTIMAT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [I] 6,7;
 [XI]DE19736629  (VOLTA KRAFTFAHRZEUG ELEKTROZUB [DE]) [X] 1-5 * figures 6-9 * [I] 6,7;
 [X]DE19629198  (CARIMO TRADE AG [LI]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1267453  (MENBER S SPA [IT]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.