Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] |
10.12.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.04.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.03.2013 | Publication of search report | published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] |
29.03.2013 | Change - classification | published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] |
28.04.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.11.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |