EP2262282 - Method for determining a frequency response and corresponding hearing aid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Medical Instruments Pte. Ltd. Block 28, Ayer Rajah Crescent No. 06-08 Singapore 139959 / SG | [2010/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Christoph Konrad Steingrubweg 8 86830 Schwabmünchen / DE | [2010/50] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10160284.5 | 19.04.2010 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | DE20091024577 | 10.06.2009 Original published format: DE102009024577 | [2010/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2262282 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2262282 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
H04R25/70 (EP,US);
H04R2205/041 (EP,US);
H04R2225/41 (EP,US);
H04R25/505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ermittlung einer Frequenzantwort einer Hörvorrichtung und zugehörige Hörvorrichtung | [2010/50] | English: | Method for determining a frequency response and corresponding hearing aid | [2010/50] | French: | Procédé de détermination d'une réponse de fréquence d'un dispositif auditif et dispositif auditif correspondant | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/19] | 11.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2009026959 (PHONAK AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10,12 * abstract * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 18 * * page 11, line 14 - line 30 * * page 15, line 3 - page 18, line 12; figures 1-3 * [A] 7,11; | [XA]EP1617705 (PHONAK AG [CH]) [X] 1-6,8-10,12 * the whole document * [A] 7,11; | [XA]EP1768446 (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-10,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020]; figure 1 * [A] 7,11 |