EP2244140 - Process Simulation Utilizing Component-Specific Consumption Data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2010/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaufman, Philip John 3856 S Kansas Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53207-4089 / US | 02 /
Walker, Marcia Elaine 12 Montcrest Drive Durham, NC 27713 / US | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10160450.2 | 20.04.2010 | [2010/43] | Priority number, date | US20090429860 | 24.04.2009 Original published format: US 429860 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2244140 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2244140 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G05B17/02 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
G05B17/02 (EP,US);
G06F30/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Prozesssimulation mit komponentenspezifischen Verbrauchsdaten | [2010/43] | English: | Process Simulation Utilizing Component-Specific Consumption Data | [2010/43] | French: | Simulation de procédé utilisant les données de consommation spécifiques au composant | [2010/43] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 17.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/46] | 08.10.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.10.2021 | 15.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005171753 (ROSING TAJANA S [US], et al) [X] 6 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] ** paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] *; | [IY] - SAMMONS N E ET AL, "Optimal biorefinery product allocation by combining process and economic modeling", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING RESEARCH AND DESIGN, PART A, INSTITUTION OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERS, XX, vol. 86, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.CHERD.2008.03.004, ISSN 0263-8762, (20080701), pages 800 - 808, (20080425), XP025678659 [I] 1-3,5 * page 801, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5; figures 1-2 * [Y] 3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cherd.2008.03.004 | [Y] - SUWALA ET AL, "Modelling adaptation of the coal industry to sustainability conditions", ENERGY, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 33, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.ENERGY.2008.02.009, ISSN 0360-5442, (20080701), pages 1015 - 1026, (20080403), XP022679118 [Y] 3 * page 1018, column L, paragraph 1 - column R, paragraph 2; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.energy.2008.02.009 |