EP2248448 - Removal apparatus for food products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aldi Einkauf GmbH & Co. oHG Burgstrasse 37 45476 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ernst, Peter Fuchsgrube 43 45478, Mülheim / DE | 02 /
Ochsenschläger, Robert Lohbecker Berg 9 45470, Mülheim / DE | [2011/40] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
Ernst, Peter Fuchsgrube 43 45478, Mülheim / DE | ||
02 /
Ochsenschläger, Robert Lohbecker Berg 9 45470, Mülheim / DE | Representative(s) | Nunnenkamp, Jörg Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Nunnenkamp, Jörg Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2010/45] | Nunnenkamp, Jörg Andrejewski Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10160932.9 | 23.04.2010 | [2010/45] | Priority number, date | DE20092006328U | 04.05.2009 Original published format: DE 202009006328 U | [2010/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2248448 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2248448 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A47F1/03, A47G19/32, A47F1/04 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
A47F1/03 (EP);
A47G19/32 (EP);
A47F2003/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | Entnahmevorrichtung für Lebensmittelprodukte | [2010/45] | English: | Removal apparatus for food products | [2010/45] | French: | Appareil de retrait de produits alimentaires | [2011/18] |
Former [2010/45] | Appareil de retrait du produits alimentaires | Examination procedure | 02.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 19.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2010 | CY | 05.10.2011 | CZ | 05.10.2011 | DK | 05.10.2011 | EE | 05.10.2011 | FI | 05.10.2011 | HR | 05.10.2011 | IT | 05.10.2011 | LT | 05.10.2011 | LV | 05.10.2011 | MK | 05.10.2011 | MT | 05.10.2011 | NL | 05.10.2011 | PL | 05.10.2011 | RO | 05.10.2011 | SE | 05.10.2011 | SI | 05.10.2011 | SK | 05.10.2011 | SM | 05.10.2011 | TR | 05.10.2011 | BG | 05.01.2012 | NO | 05.01.2012 | GR | 06.01.2012 | IS | 05.02.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | LU | 23.04.2012 | BE | 30.04.2012 | FR | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
SM | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
LU | 23.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/14] | SI | 05.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE20104106U (EUREKA ANNEGRET DRUEKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10318279 (DIE BACKFABRIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1669009 (HERTEL GUENTHER [DE]) [A] 1-10* the whole document * | by applicant | DE9204232U | EP1728456 |