EP2256757 - Current transformer as well as protection device and circuit breaker including such transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB S.p.A. Via Vittor Pisani 16 20124 Milano / IT | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergamini, Alessio / Via Montanelli, 2 24020, Ardesio (BG) / IT | 02 /
Gamba, Federico / Via Pescaria, 7/B 24123, Bergamo / IT | [2012/03] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
Bergamini, Alessio Via Montanelli, 2 24020, Ardesio (BG) / IT | ||
02 /
Gamba, Federico Via Pescaria, 7/B 24123, Bergamo / IT | Representative(s) | De Santis, Giovanni ABB S.p.A. Via L. Lama, 33 20099 Sesto San Giovanni (MI) / IT | [2012/03] |
Former [2010/48] | De Santis, Giovanni ABB S.p.A. Via L. Lama, 33 20099 Sesto San Giovanni (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 10160995.6 | 26.04.2010 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | IT2009BG00031 | 28.05.2009 Original published format: IT BG20090031 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2256757 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2256757 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01F38/30, H01H83/14 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
H01F38/30 (EP,US);
H01H71/125 (EP,US);
H01H83/144 (EP,US);
H01H9/52 (EP,US);
H01F2038/305 (EP,US);
H01F27/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | Stromtransformator und zugehörige Schutzvorrichtung und Trennschalter mit solch einem Transformator | [2010/48] | English: | Current transformer as well as protection device and circuit breaker including such transformer | [2010/48] | French: | Transformateur de courant ainsi que dispositif de protection et disjoncteur incluant ledit transformateur | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/27] | 05.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2010 | AT | 18.01.2012 | BE | 18.01.2012 | CY | 18.01.2012 | CZ | 18.01.2012 | DK | 18.01.2012 | EE | 18.01.2012 | FI | 18.01.2012 | HR | 18.01.2012 | LT | 18.01.2012 | LV | 18.01.2012 | MK | 18.01.2012 | MT | 18.01.2012 | NL | 18.01.2012 | PL | 18.01.2012 | RO | 18.01.2012 | SI | 18.01.2012 | SK | 18.01.2012 | SM | 18.01.2012 | BG | 18.04.2012 | NO | 18.04.2012 | IE | 26.04.2012 | LU | 26.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | IS | 18.05.2012 | PT | 18.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
SM | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IE | 26.04.2012 | ||
LU | 26.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IE | 26.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IE | 26.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IE | 26.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3662137 (CLEAVELAND CHARLES M) [A] 1-4,7-15 * claims 1-4 * * figures 5,7 *; | [A]US3816682 (MACBETH J) [A] 1-3,10-15 * claim 1 ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4123618 (CUSHING GEORGE B, et al) [A] 1-4,7-15 * claim 1 * * column 12, line 58 - line 63 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB2068646 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME AG, et al) [A] 1,10-15 * claim 1 * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]DE10013143 (AEG NIEDERSPANNUNGSTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,10-15 * claims 1,10,11,14,20,21 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0035] * * figures 1,6 * |