EP2222123 - Methods, receivers, and computer program products for determining transmission power control commands using biased interpretation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2010/34] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernhardsson, Bo Spjutgränden 5 224 75, Lund / SE | 02 /
Nilsson, Johan Trulsibrunnvägen 20 A SE-236 38, Höllviken / SE | 03 /
Jonsson, Elias Södra Promenaden 3 211 29, Malmö / SE | 04 /
Lindoff, Bengt Morkullevägen 45 237 36, Bjärred / SE | [2013/50] |
Former [2010/34] | 01 /
Bernhardsson, Bo Spjutgränden 5 224 75, Lund / SE | ||
02 /
Nilsson, Johan Trulsibrunnvägen 20 A SE-236 38, Höllviken / SE | |||
03 /
Jonsson, Elias Södra Promenaden 3 211 29, Malmö / SE | |||
04 /
Lindoff, Bengt Morkullevägen 45 237 36, Bjärred / SE | Representative(s) | Andersson, Karl Ola, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Gothenburg Lund Nya Vattentornet 221 83 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Andersson, Karl Ola, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Lund 221 83 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2010/34] | Ström & Gulliksson AB Studentgatan 1 P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 10161115.0 | 10.09.2003 | [2010/34] | Priority number, date | US20020412898P | 23.09.2002 Original published format: US 412898 P | US20020431552P | 05.12.2002 Original published format: US 431552 P | US20030445759 | 27.05.2003 Original published format: US 445759 | [2010/34] | Previously filed application, date | WO2003EP10026 | 10.09.2003 | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2222123 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2222123 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2222123 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/40, H04W52/56 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
H04W52/56 (EP,US);
H04W52/54 (KR);
H04W52/40 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren, Empfänger und Rechnerprogrammprodukte zur Bestimmung von Bertragungsleistungsbefehlen unter Verwendung von priorisierter Interpretation | [2010/34] | English: | Methods, receivers, and computer program products for determining transmission power control commands using biased interpretation | [2010/34] | French: | Procédés, récepteurs et produits pour programme d'ordinateur pour la détermination de commandes de contrôle de puissance d'émission par interprétation systémati | [2010/34] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 11.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 01.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03773622.0 / EP1549437 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030773622) is 09.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 01.07.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 01.07.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.11.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2003 | AT | 11.12.2013 | BE | 11.12.2013 | BG | 11.12.2013 | CY | 11.12.2013 | CZ | 11.12.2013 | DK | 11.12.2013 | EE | 11.12.2013 | ES | 11.12.2013 | FI | 11.12.2013 | IT | 11.12.2013 | MC | 11.12.2013 | RO | 11.12.2013 | SE | 11.12.2013 | SI | 11.12.2013 | SK | 11.12.2013 | TR | 11.12.2013 | GR | 12.03.2014 | PT | 11.04.2014 | IE | 10.09.2014 | LU | 10.09.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 10.09.2003 | |
AT | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
SE | 11.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0049728 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 6-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6269239 (HASHEM BASSAM [CA], et al) [Y] 6-8* the whole document *; | [XAY] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Physical layer procedures (FDD) (3GPP TS 25.214 version 3.7.0 Release 1999); ETSI TS 125 214", IEEE, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20010601), vol. 3-R1, no. V3.7.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014008396 [X] 1,9 * pages 14-15 * [A] 2-5,10-13 [Y] 6-8 | by applicant | US6343218 | US19990344899 | US20020412898 | US20020431552 |