EP2251612 - Electric radiator with heat-transfer fluid made up of moulded modular elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atlantic Industrie Rue Monge 85000 La Roche sur Yon / FR | [2010/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brot, Roland 38 rue des Tanneurs 85000 Mouilleron Le Captif / FR | 02 /
Williamson, Benoît 2 rue du Morvan 44230 Saint Sebastien sur Loire / FR | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Le Cloirec, Claudine, et al Ipsilon 3, rue Edouard Nignon 44300 Nantes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Le Cloirec, Claudine, et al Brema-Loyer 3 rue Edouard Nignon 44300 Nantes / FR | ||
Former [2010/46] | Le Cloirec, Claudine BREMA-LOYER 9, Rue Edmé Mariotte B.P. 70620 44306 Nantes Cedex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10161333.9 | 28.04.2010 | [2010/46] | Priority number, date | FR20090002132 | 04.05.2009 Original published format: FR 0902132 | [2010/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2251612 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F24D13/04, F24H3/00, F28D1/02, F28F9/26, F28F21/08 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
F24H3/004 (EP);
F28D1/0226 (EP);
F28F21/084 (EP);
F28F21/088 (EP);
F28F9/266 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrisches Heizgerät mit Wärmeübertragungsflüssigkeit, das aus gegossenen Modulelementen besteht | [2010/46] | English: | Electric radiator with heat-transfer fluid made up of moulded modular elements | [2010/46] | French: | Radiateur électrique à fluide caloporteur formé d'éléments modulaires moulés | [2010/46] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 20.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/39] | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2351361 (BRAPAL SA [LI]) [A] 1-3,5-7 * pages 8-14; figures 1-11 *; | [A]WO0070286 (STEFANINI DANIEL [GB], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 12, paragraph 3 - page 14, paragraph 2; figures 11-15 *; | [A]FR2098897 (THOMSON CSF) [A] 1 * pages 1-2; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1884721 (DL RADIATORS SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1655546 (BORELLI LUIGI [IT]) [A] 1-3,5-7 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0026] - [0032]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0921368 (AVILION LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE2308480 (VIESSMANN HANS) [A] 1 * pages 6-10; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | FR20070009080 |