EP2383293 - Immunoassay for Chromogranin A, antibodies and kit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Euro-Diagnostica AB P.O. Box 50117 202 11 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states Euro-diagnostica AB P.O. Box 50117 202 11 Malmö / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stridsberg, Mats Grandungevägen 13 75646 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
Sommarin, Yngve P.O. Box 50117 20211 Malmö / SE | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Habets, Winand Johannes Antonius Life Science Patents P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Habets, Winand Life Science Patents PO Box 5096 6130 PB Sittard / NL | Application number, filing date | 10161375.0 | 28.04.2010 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2383293 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, G01N33/53, G01N33/577, G01N33/68 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
G01N33/577 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/26 (US);
C07K16/30 (US);
G01N33/53 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Immunoassay für Chromogranin A, sowie Antikörper und Kit | [2011/44] | English: | Immunoassay for Chromogranin A, antibodies and kit | [2011/44] | French: | Dosage immunologique de la Chromogranine A, anticorps et kit | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/44] | 11.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP1078266 (CIS BIO INT [FR]) [YD] 1-4 * examples 2, 3; claims 1-21; tables 2, 3 * * the whole document *; | [I] - TARTAGLIA ANDREAS ET AL, "Chromogranin A in gastric neuroendocrine tumours: an immunohistochemical and biochemical study with region-specific antibodies.", VIRCHOWS ARCHIV : AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY APR 2006 LNKD- PUBMED:16408221, (200604), vol. 448, no. 4, ISSN 0945-6317, pages 399 - 406, XP002585661 [I] 1-4 * tables 2, 3 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00428-005-0113-1 | [I] - PORTELA-GOMES G M ET AL, "Chromogranin A in human neuroendocrine tumors: An immunohistochemical study with region-specific antibodies", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF SURGICAL PATHOLOGY, RAVEN PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20010101), vol. 25, no. 10, ISSN 0147-5185, pages 1261 - 1267, XP009134371 [I] 1-4 * tables 2, 3 * * the whole document * | [Y] - CORTI A ET AL, "Antigenic regions of human chromogranin A and their topographic relationships with structural/functional domains.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY / FEBS 15 JAN 1996 LNKD- PUBMED:8631342, (19960115), vol. 235, no. 1-2, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 275 - 280, XP002585662 [Y] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - GILL B M ET AL, "Chromogranin a epitopes: Clues from synthetic peptides and peptide mapping", NEUROPEPTIDES, CHURCHILL LIVINGSTONE, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0143-4179(92)90521-W, vol. 21, no. 2, ISSN 0143-4179, (19920201), pages 105 - 118, (19920201), XP026324392 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0143-4179(92)90521-W | [A] - STRIDSBERG M, "Measurements of chromogranins and chromogranin-related peptides by immunological methods.", ADVANCES IN EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY 2000 LNKD- PUBMED:11192592, (2000), vol. 482, ISSN 0065-2598, pages 319 - 327, XP009134372 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4758522 | EP1078266 | - BAJETTA, E.; FERRARI, L.; MARTINETTI, A.; CELIO, L.; PROCOPIO, G.; ARTALE, S.; ZILEMBO, N.; DI BARTOLOMEO, M.; SEREGNI, E.; BOMBAR, "Chromogranin A, neuron specific enolase, carcinoembryonic antigen, and hydroxyindole acetic acid evaluation in patient with neuroendocrine tumours", CANCER, (1999), vol. 86, pages 858 - 865 | - ERIKSSON, B.; OBERG, K.; STRIDSBERG, M., "Tumour markers in neuroendocrine tumours", DIGESTION, (2000), vol. 62, pages 33 - 38 | - K6HLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - KONECKI ET AL., BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 17026 - 17030 | - O'CONNOR, D.T.; DEFTOS, L.J., "Secretion of chromogranin A by peptide-producing endocrine neoplasms", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1986), vol. 314, pages 1145 - 1151 | - STRIDSBERG, M.; HELLMAN, U.; WILANDER, E.; LUNDQVIST, G.; HELLSING, K.; OBERG, K., "Fragments of chromogranin A are present in the urine of patients with carcinoid tumours: Development of a specific radioimmunoassay for chromogranin A and its fragments", JOURNAL OF ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1993), vol. 139, pages 329 - 337 | - STRIDSBERG, M.; OBERG, K.; LI, Q.; ENGSTR6M, U.; LUNDQVIST, G., "Measurements of chromogranin A, chromogranin B (secretogranin I), chromogranin C (secretogranin II) and pancreastatin in plasma and urine from patients with carcinoid tumours and endocrine pancreatic tumours", JOURNAL OF ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1995), vol. 144, pages 49 - 59 | - STRIDSBERG, M., "Measurements of chromogranins and chromogranin-related peptides by immunological methods", ADVANCED EXPERIMENTAL AND MEDICAL BIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 482, pages 319 - 327 | - WINKLER, H.; FISCHER-COLBRIE, R., "The chromogranin A and B: The first 25 years and future perspectives", NEUROSCIENCE, (1992), vol. 49, pages 497 - 528 |