EP2246676 - Spectral colorimetric apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Kazumi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
Teramura, Masayasu c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
Tochigi, Nobuyuki c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 04 /
Takizawa, Tokuji c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10161413.9 | 29.04.2010 | [2010/44] | Priority number, date | JP20090110878 | 30.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009110878 | JP20100081566 | 31.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010081566 | [2010/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2246676 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2246676 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/02, G01J3/50 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
G01J3/02 (EP,US);
G01J3/0205 (EP,US);
G01J3/0208 (EP,US);
G01J3/024 (EP,US);
G01J3/50 (EP,US);
G01J3/502 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] |
Former [2010/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spektrales Farbmessgerät | [2010/44] | English: | Spectral colorimetric apparatus | [2010/44] | French: | Colorimètre spectral | [2010/44] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2010 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 27.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4540282 (LANDA ISAAC J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [XA]JPH0658812 (JUKI KK) [X] 1,12 * abstract * [A] 2-11; | [A]EP1041372 (GRETAG MACBETH AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [A]JP2001264173 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US2006290936 (IMURA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]JP2009008471 (CANON KK) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | Examination | US4540282 | by applicant | JPH0658812 | JPH0694528 | JPH09160343 | JP2000298066 | JP2002206967 | JP2004126278 |