EP2284954 - A socket formed by an outer cover and a system for fastening the outer cover in said socket. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/07] | System for fastening the outer cover in sockets | ||
[2018/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric España, S.A. Bac de Roda, 52, Edificio A 08019 Barcelona / ES | [2019/08] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Espana, S.A. Bac de Roda, 52, Edificio A 08019 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rebolé Olleta, Jose Antonio c/Concejo de Alzuza, No. 49 3° C 31016 Pamplona / ES | [2019/08] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
Rebolé Olleta, Jose Antonio c/Concejo de Alzuza, No. 49 3° C 31016, Pamplona / ES | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/08] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2012/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2011/07] | Bérogin, Francis, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10161571.4 | 30.04.2010 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | ES20090001616 | 21.07.2009 Original published format: ES 200901616 | [2011/07] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2284954 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2284954 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/506, H02G3/14, H01R13/655, H01R24/78, // H01R103/00 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
H01R13/506 (EP,ES);
H01R13/655 (EP);
H01R24/28 (ES);
H01R24/78 (EP);
H02G3/14 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | H01R13/506, H01R24/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2011/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Steckdose, die aus einer Außenabdeckung und einem System zur Befestigung der Außenabdeckung in derSteckdose gebildet ist. | [2018/37] | English: | A socket formed by an outer cover and a system for fastening the outer cover in said socket. | [2018/37] | French: | Douille formée par un couvercle extérieur et un système pour fixer le couvercle extérieur dans ladite douille. | [2018/37] |
Former [2011/07] | System zur Befestigung der Außenabdeckung von Fassungen | ||
Former [2011/07] | System for fastening the outer cover in sockets | ||
Former [2011/07] | Système pour fixer le couvercle extérieur dans les douilles | Examination procedure | 16.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2017 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 17.11.2017 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 14.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2010 | AT | 20.02.2019 | CY | 20.02.2019 | CZ | 20.02.2019 | DK | 20.02.2019 | EE | 20.02.2019 | FI | 20.02.2019 | GR | 20.02.2019 | HR | 20.02.2019 | IT | 20.02.2019 | LT | 20.02.2019 | LV | 20.02.2019 | MC | 20.02.2019 | MK | 20.02.2019 | MT | 20.02.2019 | NL | 20.02.2019 | PL | 20.02.2019 | SE | 20.02.2019 | SI | 20.02.2019 | SK | 20.02.2019 | SM | 20.02.2019 | TR | 20.02.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | IE | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | LU | 30.04.2019 | GB | 20.05.2019 | NO | 20.05.2019 | IS | 20.06.2019 | PT | 20.06.2019 | DE | 01.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 30.04.2010 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
GR | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
MT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
DE | 01.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.04.2010 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
GR | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
DE | 01.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/30] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
GR | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
DE | 01.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
DE | 01.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
DE | 01.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
DE | 01.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
DE | 01.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
DE | 01.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
DE | 01.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | CZ | 20.02.2019 | |
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | CZ | 20.02.2019 | |
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 20.02.2019 | |
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 20.02.2019 | |
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0743703 (NOZICK JACQUES [FR]); | [Y]FR2888676 (EFAPEL EMPRESA FABRIL DE PRODU [PT]); | [Y]EP1837961 (LEGRAND FRANCE [FR], et al) | Examination | FR2703843 | US2003236024 |