EP2213652 - Stilbene derivatives and their use for binding and imaging amyloid plaques [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania 3160 Chestnut Street, Suite 200 Philadelphia, PA 19104-6283 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania 3160 Chestnut Street, Suite 200 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19104-6283 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kung, Hank F. 525 Foxglove Lane Wynnewood, PA 19096 / US | 02 /
Kung, Mei-Ping 525 Foxglove Lane Wynnewood, PA 19096 / US | 03 /
Zhuang, Zhi-Ping 3700 Market Street, Room 305 Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | [2014/43] |
Former [2010/31] | 01 /
Kung, Hank F. 525 Foxglove Lane Wynnewood, PA 19096 / US | ||
02 /
Kung, Mei-Ping 525 Foxglove Lane Wynnewood, PA 19096 / US | |||
03 /
Zhuang, Zhi-Ping 3700 Market Street, Room 305 Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | Representative(s) | Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2014/43] |
Former [2010/31] | Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10161604.3 | 19.12.2005 | [2010/31] | Priority number, date | US20040636696P | 17.12.2004 Original published format: US 636696 P | US20050686395P | 02.06.2005 Original published format: US 686395 P | [2010/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2213652 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2213652 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07C217/80, A61K31/135 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
A61K51/04 (EP,NO,US);
C07C217/80 (EP,NO,US);
C07C15/02 (KR);
A61K31/115 (KR);
A61K31/135 (NO);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07B59/001 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | Stilbenderivate und ihre Verwendung zum Binden und Abbilden von Amyloidplaques | [2010/31] | English: | Stilbene derivatives and their use for binding and imaging amyloid plaques | [2010/31] | French: | Dérivés de stilbène et leur utilisation pour l'imagerie des plaques amyloïdes et leur liaison | [2010/31] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05854410.7 / EP1841465 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050854410) is 08.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 22.10.2014 | CY | 22.10.2014 | RO | 22.10.2014 | IS | 22.02.2015 | [2016/25] |
Former [2015/36] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | IS | 22.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO03018070 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0018] , [0078]; figure 4; claims 1,36,37; compounds 70,71 * | by applicant | - XIA, W. ET AL., J PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2000), vol. 97, pages 9299 - 9304 | - SELKOE, D., J. JAMA, (2000), vol. 283, pages 1615 - 1617 | - WOLFE, M.S. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1998), vol. 41, pages 6 - 9 | - SKOVRONSKY, D.M.; LEE, V.M., TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (2000), vol. 21, pages 161 - 163 | - SELKOE, D. J., J AM. MED. ASSOC., (2000), vol. 283, pages 1615 - 1617 | - NASLUND, J. ET AL., J AM. MED. ASSOC., (2000), vol. 283, pages 1571 - 1577 | - GOLDE, T. E. ET AL., BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (2000), vol. 1502, pages 172 - 187 | - SKOVRONSKY, D. M.; LEE, V. M., TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (2000), vol. 21, pages 161 - 163 | - VASSAR, R. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 286, pages 735 - 741 | - WOLFE, M. S. ET AL., J MED. CHEM., (1998), vol. 41, pages 6 - 9 | - MOORE, C. L. ET AL., J MED CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, pages 3434 - 3442 | - FINDEIS, M. A., BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (2000), vol. 1502, pages 76 - 84 | - KUNER, P.; BOHRMANN ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, pages 1673 - 1678 | - ASHBURN, T. T. ET AL., CHEM. BIOL., (1996), vol. 3, pages 351 - 358 | - HAN, G. ET AL., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1996), vol. 118, pages 4506 - 4507 | - KLUNK, W. E. ET AL., BIOL. PSYCHIATRY, (1994), vol. 35, page 627 | - KLUNK, W. E. ET AL., NEUROBIOL. AGING, (1995), vol. 16, pages 541 - 548 | - KLUNK, W. E. ET AL., SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT, (1997), vol. 23, page 1638 | - MATHIS, C. A. ET AL., PROC. XLLTH INTL. SYMP. RADIOPHARM. CHEM., UPPSALA, SWEDEN, (1997), pages 94 - 95 | - LORENZO, A.; YANKNER, B. A., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1994), vol. 91, pages 12243 - 12247 | - ZHEN, W. ET AL., J MED. CHEM., (1999), vol. 42, pages 2805 - 2815 | - KLUNK, W. E. ET AL., J HISTOCHEM. CYTOCHEM., (1989), vol. 37, pages 1273 - 1281 | - MATHIS, C. A. ET AL., PROC. XIITH INTL. SYMP. RADIOPHARM. CHEM., UPPSALA, SWEDEN, (1997), pages 94 - 95 | - ELHADDAOUI, A. ET AL., BIOSPECTROSCOPY, (1995), vol. 1, pages 351 - 356 | - SHOGHI-JADID K ET AL., AM J GERIATR PSYCHIATRY., (2002), vol. 10, pages 24 - 35 | - NORDBERG A., LANCET NEUROL., (2004), vol. 3, pages 519 - 27 | - AGDEPPA ED ET AL., NEUROSCIENCE, (2003), vol. 117, pages 723 - 30 | - MATHIS CA ET AL., CURR PHARM DES., (2004), vol. 10, pages 1469 - 92 | - MATHIS CA ET AL., ARCH. NEUROL., (2005), vol. 62, pages 196 - 200 | - KUNG M-P ET AL., BRAIN RES., (2004), vol. 1025, pages 98 - 105 | - VERHOEFF NP ET AL., AM J GERIATR PSYCHIATRY, (2004), vol. 12, pages 584 - 95 | - ONO M ET AL., NUCL MED BIOL., (2003), vol. 30, pages 565 - 71 | - WILSON A ET AL., J LABELLED CPD RADIOPHARM., (2003), vol. 46, page 561 | - COX DP ET AL., J ORG CHEM., (1984), vol. 49, pages 3216 - 19 | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2002), vol. 43, pages 2877 - 2879 | - BERGE S. M. ET AL., PHARMACEUTICAL SALTS, J PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - KUNG M-P ET AL., EURO J NUCL MED MOL IMAG., (2004), vol. 31, pages 1136 - 45 |