EP2251498 - Support frame and relative assembly method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eltec S.n.c. di Polensig Gianluca & C. Via del Lavoro Artigiano, 3 34077 Ronchi dei Legionari (GO) / IT | [2010/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Polensig, Gianluca / Via del Capitello, 65 34077 Ronchi dei Legionari (GO) / IT | [2012/25] |
Former [2010/46] | 01 /
Polensig, Gianluca Via del Capitello, 65 34077 Ronchi dei Legionari (GO) / IT | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 10161651.4 | 30.04.2010 | [2010/46] | Priority number, date | IT2009UD00084 | 04.05.2009 Original published format: IT UD20090084 | [2010/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2251498 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2251498 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/76, F16B7/04, E04H1/12 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
E04B2/766 (EP);
E04B2/761 (EP);
E04B2002/725 (EP);
F16B7/025 (EP);
F16B7/187 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | Stützrahmen und entsprechendes Montageverfahren | [2010/46] | English: | Support frame and relative assembly method | [2010/46] | French: | Cadre de support et procédé d'assemblage associé | [2010/46] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 25.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2010 | AT | 20.06.2012 | BE | 20.06.2012 | CY | 20.06.2012 | CZ | 20.06.2012 | DK | 20.06.2012 | EE | 20.06.2012 | FI | 20.06.2012 | HR | 20.06.2012 | LT | 20.06.2012 | LV | 20.06.2012 | MC | 20.06.2012 | MK | 20.06.2012 | MT | 20.06.2012 | NL | 20.06.2012 | PL | 20.06.2012 | RO | 20.06.2012 | SE | 20.06.2012 | SI | 20.06.2012 | SK | 20.06.2012 | SM | 20.06.2012 | TR | 20.06.2012 | BG | 20.09.2012 | NO | 20.09.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | ES | 01.10.2012 | IS | 20.10.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
MK | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
SM | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
SM | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 20.06.2012 | |
NO | 20.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3672710 (KROOPP KARL-GUNNAR) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, lines 13-18 *; | [A]DE9111163U (JOST, PETER, DIPL.-ING., 3260 RINTELN, DE) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2685403 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,3-5,8 * figures 1-11 * * claims 1,2,7,8 *; | [A]EP1070859 (FMS FOERDER UND MONTAGE SYSTEM [DE]) [A] 1,6 * figures 5,6,12,13 * * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] * |