12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
17.02.2017 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
05.10.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
05.10.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected |
|
29.07.2016 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
08.07.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
11.01.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
02.12.2015 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
20.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
22.01.2014 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
13.12.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
29.11.2013 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
20.11.2013 |
Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
23.07.2013 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
28.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
28.06.2013 |
Opposition filed |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
07.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
03.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
15.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
01.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
25.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
17.08.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
03.08.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.08.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.01.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
13.01.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
03.06.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
27.05.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.10.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] |