EP2256330 - Intake noise damper of an internal combustion engine, and intake conduit comprising same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2, rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caliskan, Alper 29 rue de la Prairie 45140 St Jean de la Ruelle / FR | [2012/38] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
Caliskan, Alper 29 rue de la Prairie 45140 St Jean de la Ruelle / FR | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Bolinches, Michel Jean-Marie, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10161869.2 | 04.05.2010 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | FR20090002400 | 18.05.2009 Original published format: FR 0902400 | [2010/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2256330 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2256330 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02M35/12, F02M35/10 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
F02M35/10144 (EP);
F02M35/10157 (EP);
F02M35/10295 (EP);
F02M35/1266 (EP);
F02M35/1283 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/48] | F02M35/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | Ansauggeräuschdämpfer einer Brennkraftmaschine, sowie diesen umfassende Ansaugleitung | [2010/48] | English: | Intake noise damper of an internal combustion engine, and intake conduit comprising same | [2010/48] | French: | Dispositif d'atténuation acoustique pour ligne d'admission d'un moteur thermique, et ligne d'admission l'incorporant. | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/27] | 20.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.2013
26.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE MANN+HUMMEL GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE Opponent's representative Herrburger, Pierre Cabinet Pierre Herrburger 67 avenue Niel 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.2013
26.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE MANN+HUMMEL GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE Opponent's representative Herrburger, Pierre Cabinet Pierre Herrburger 115, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2014/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.2013
26.07.2013
ADMISSIBLE MANN+HUMMEL GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
Former [2013/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.2013
MANN+HUMMEL GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE Opponent's representative Seyboth, Matthias Mann+Hummel GmbH Patentabteilung VR-P Hindenburgstraße 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | 24.07.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.01.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.09.2016 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/12] | 14.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.10.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.10.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2010 | AL | 19.09.2012 | AT | 19.09.2012 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | HR | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | MC | 19.09.2012 | MK | 19.09.2012 | MT | 19.09.2012 | NL | 19.09.2012 | PL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | SM | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | NO | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | PT | 21.01.2013 | IE | 04.05.2013 | LU | 04.05.2013 | BE | 31.05.2013 | GB | 04.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 04.05.2010 | |
AT | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
MK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 04.05.2013 | ||
LU | 04.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
GB | 04.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
MK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 04.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
GB | 04.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 04.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
GB | 04.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 04.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 04.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 04.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CZ | 19.09.2012 | |
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CZ | 19.09.2012 | |
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CZ | 19.09.2012 | |
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | |
NO | 19.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19960427 (MUENDENER GUMMIWERK GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,13 * column 2, lines 42-54; figure 6 * [Y] 4-12; | [Y]DE19956172 (UMFOTEC UMFORMTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 4-9,12 * column 1, lines 53-62 * * column 1, line 69 - column 2, line 8; figure 2 *; | [Y]DE102006038830 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 10,11 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027]; figure 2 *; | [A]DE102004049446 (UMFOTEC UMFORMTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] , [0014] , [0025] , [0027]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]JPS59141707 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]DE19957597 (UMFOTEC UMFORMTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 2b *; | [XP]EP2128425 (HUTCHINSON [FR]) [XP] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19956172 | US4874062 |