EP2249507 - Method for decoding a probabilistic anti-collusion code [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perez-Freire, Luis c/o THOMSON 1 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443, ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | 02 /
Furon, Teddy c/o THOMSON 1 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443, ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | [2013/13] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
Perez-Freire, Luis c/o THOMSON 1 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443, ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | ||
02 /
Furon, Teddy c/o THOMSON 1 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443, ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | Representative(s) | Lorette, Anne TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Lorette, Anne Technicolor 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2010/45] | Lorette, Anne Technicolor 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 10162088.8 | 06.05.2010 | [2010/45] | Priority number, date | FR20090053071 | 07.05.2009 Original published format: FR 0953071 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2249507 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2249507 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
H04L9/32 (EP,US);
H04L2209/606 (EP,US);
H04L2209/608 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Dekodierung eines probabilistischen Anti-Kollusionskodes | [2010/45] | English: | Method for decoding a probabilistic anti-collusion code | [2010/45] | French: | Méthode de décodage d'un code anti-collusion probabiliste | [2010/45] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 04.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2010 | AL | 27.03.2013 | AT | 27.03.2013 | BE | 27.03.2013 | CY | 27.03.2013 | CZ | 27.03.2013 | DK | 27.03.2013 | EE | 27.03.2013 | FI | 27.03.2013 | HR | 27.03.2013 | IT | 27.03.2013 | LT | 27.03.2013 | LV | 27.03.2013 | MC | 27.03.2013 | MK | 27.03.2013 | MT | 27.03.2013 | NL | 27.03.2013 | PL | 27.03.2013 | RO | 27.03.2013 | SE | 27.03.2013 | SI | 27.03.2013 | SK | 27.03.2013 | SM | 27.03.2013 | TR | 27.03.2013 | IE | 06.05.2013 | LU | 06.05.2013 | BG | 27.06.2013 | NO | 27.06.2013 | GR | 28.06.2013 | ES | 08.07.2013 | IS | 27.07.2013 | PT | 29.07.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 06.05.2010 | |
AT | 27.03.2013 | ||
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
MK | 27.03.2013 | ||
MT | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
SM | 27.03.2013 | ||
TR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 06.05.2013 | ||
LU | 06.05.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
MK | 27.03.2013 | ||
MT | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
SM | 27.03.2013 | ||
TR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 06.05.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
MT | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
SM | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 06.05.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
MT | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 06.05.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 06.05.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
NO | 27.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009049558 (LOTSPIECH JEFFREY BRUCE [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0049] *; | [XA] - ANTHAPADMANABHAN N, "Random codes and graphs for secure communication", DISSERTATION UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND,, (20090401), pages A,B,C,I, - X,1-170, URL: http://www.lib.umd.edu/drum/bitstream/1903/9293/1/Anthapadmanabhan_umd_0117E_10319.pdf, (20100310), XP007912192 [X] 1,2,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] - [0007] * [A] 3-14 | [XA] - FRÉDÉRIC CÉROU ET AL, "Experimental Assessment of the Reliability for Watermarking and Fingerprinting Schemes", EURASIP JOURNAL ON INFORMATION SECURITY, HINDAWI PUBLISHING CORP, US, vol. 2008, ISSN 1687-4161, (20081127), pages 1 - 12, URL: http://www.hindawi.com/journals/is/2008/414962.abs.html, (20100310), XP007912200 [X] 1,2,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] * [A] 3-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2008/414962 | [XA] - MOULIN P, "Universal Fingerprinting: Capacity and Random-Coding Exponents", 20081209, (20081209), pages 1 - 57, URL: http://arxiv.org/PS_cache/arxiv/pdf/0801/0801.3837v2.pdf, (20100310), XP007912193 [X] 1,2,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] * [A] 3-14 | [XA] - TEDDY FURON ET AL, On the Design and Optimization of Tardos Probabilistic Fingerprinting Codes, INFORMATION HIDING; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 341 - 356, (20080519), ISBN 9783540889601, XP019109700 [X] 1,2,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] * [A] 3-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-88961-8_24 | [A] - SKORIC B ET AL, "Tardos Fingerprinting is Better Than We Thought", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, IEEE, US, (20080801), vol. 54, no. 8, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 3663 - 3676, XP011231456 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [00II] - paragraph [00IV] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.2008.926307 | [A] - STEFAN KATZENBEISSER ET AL, Combining Tardos Fingerprinting Codes and Fingercasting, INFORMATION HIDING; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 294 - 310, (20060710), ISBN 9783540773696, XP019085930 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-77370-2_20 | [A] - TAMIR TASSA, "Low Bandwidth Dynamic Traitor Tracing Schemes", JOURNAL OF CRYPTOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20050401), vol. 18, no. 2, ISSN 1432-1378, pages 167 - 183, XP019362628 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - ODED BLAYER ET AL, "Improved versions of Tardosâ fingerprinting scheme", DESIGNS, CODES AND CRYPTOGRAPHY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20080325), vol. 48, no. 1, ISSN 1573-7586, pages 79 - 103, XP019602859 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * | [A] - AMIRI E ET AL, "High rate fingerprinting codes and the fingerprinting capacity Full text", SYMPOSIUM ON DISCRETE ALGORITHMS ARCHIVE PROCEEDINGS OF THE TWENTIETH ANNUAL ACM-SIAM SYMPOSIUM ON DISCRETE ALGORITHMS, 20090104, US, (20090104), pages 336 - 345, URL: http://www.siam.org/proceedings/soda/2009/SODA09_038_amirie.pdf, (20100310), XP007912198 [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] * |