EP2371220 - Stabilized bio-available soluble silicate solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): PL | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taminco Pantserschipstraat 207 9000 Gent / BE | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roose, Peter A. De Pesseroeylaan 18 9831 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | 02 /
Demuynck, Marc Ruienhovestraat 7 9032 Wondelgem / BE | 03 /
De Saegher, Johan Prosper de Troyerlaan 7 9070 Destelbergen / BE | 04 /
Rabasse, Jean-Michel rue Laugier, 18 75008 Paris / FR | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Coulon, Ludivine, et al Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [2013/50] |
Former [2011/40] | Leherte, Georges M.L.M., et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 10162186.0 | 06.05.2010 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | EP20100158686 | 31.03.2010 Original published format: EP 10158686 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2371220 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2371220 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2371220 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01N59/00, A01N25/22, A01N25/02, A01N25/12, A01N47/14, A01N47/12, A01P3/00, A01P21/00, C05G3/02, C05G3/00, C01B33/141, A23K1/175, C01B33/148, C01B33/32 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
A01N59/00 (EP,US);
A01N25/02 (US);
A01N25/12 (US);
A01N25/22 (US);
A01N47/12 (US);
A01N47/14 (US);
A23D7/0053 (EP,US);
A23K20/28 (EP,US);
A61K33/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/42 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C01B33/22 (EP,US);
C05C9/00 (EP,US);
C05D1/00 (EP,US);
C05D9/00 (EP,US);
C05D9/02 (EP,US);
C05F11/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N59/00, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/00, A01N25/02, A01N25/12, A01N25/22, A01N47/12, A01N47/14 (EP,US);
C05C9/00, C05D1/00, C05D9/02, C05F11/10, C05G3/60 (US,EP);
C05D1/00, C05D9/02, C05F11/10, C05G3/60 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] |
Former [2011/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stabilisierte, bioverfügbare, lösliche Silikatlösung | [2011/40] | English: | Stabilized bio-available soluble silicate solution | [2011/40] | French: | Solution de silicate soluble biodisponible et stabilisée | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 27.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 21.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2015/41] | 12.10.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.04.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.05.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.05.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.08.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.12.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 20.07.2017 | Appeal received No. T1655/17 | 25.08.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.06.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 21.06.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 20.06.2012 | ID: | 02 | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 20.06.2012 | [2012/44] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2010 | AL | 03.12.2014 | AT | 03.12.2014 | BG | 03.12.2014 | CY | 03.12.2014 | CZ | 03.12.2014 | DK | 03.12.2014 | EE | 03.12.2014 | FI | 03.12.2014 | HR | 03.12.2014 | LT | 03.12.2014 | LV | 03.12.2014 | MC | 03.12.2014 | MK | 03.12.2014 | MT | 03.12.2014 | PL | 03.12.2014 | RO | 03.12.2014 | SE | 03.12.2014 | SI | 03.12.2014 | SK | 03.12.2014 | SM | 03.12.2014 | TR | 03.12.2014 | NO | 03.03.2015 | IS | 03.04.2015 | PT | 03.04.2015 | IE | 06.05.2015 | LU | 06.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | GB | 06.05.2016 | [2019/10] |
Former [2018/50] | HU | 06.05.2010 | |
AL | 03.12.2014 | ||
AT | 03.12.2014 | ||
BG | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MK | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
SM | 03.12.2014 | ||
TR | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 06.05.2015 | ||
LU | 06.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
GB | 06.05.2016 | ||
PL | 06.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | HU | 06.05.2010 | |
AL | 03.12.2014 | ||
AT | 03.12.2014 | ||
BG | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MK | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
SM | 03.12.2014 | ||
TR | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 06.05.2015 | ||
LU | 06.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
GB | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/37] | HU | 06.05.2010 | |
AT | 03.12.2014 | ||
BG | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MK | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
SM | 03.12.2014 | ||
TR | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 06.05.2015 | ||
LU | 06.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
GB | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 06.05.2010 | |
AT | 03.12.2014 | ||
BG | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MK | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
SM | 03.12.2014 | ||
TR | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 06.05.2015 | ||
LU | 06.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
GB | 06.05.2016 | ||
GR | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 06.05.2010 | |
AT | 03.12.2014 | ||
BG | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
SM | 03.12.2014 | ||
TR | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 06.05.2015 | ||
LU | 06.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
GB | 06.05.2016 | ||
GR | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | HU | 06.05.2010 | |
AT | 03.12.2014 | ||
BG | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
SM | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 06.05.2015 | ||
LU | 06.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
GB | 06.05.2016 | ||
GR | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 06.05.2015 | ||
LU | 06.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
GR | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 06.05.2015 | ||
LU | 06.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 06.05.2015 | ||
LU | 06.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
LU | 06.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
LU | 06.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 03.12.2014 | |
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 03.12.2014 | |
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 03.12.2014 | |
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 03.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2010055166 (AGC FLAT GLASS EUROPE SA [BE], et al) [E] 1,3,6-11,17-20 * page 14, line 16 - line 19 * * page 16, line 14 - line 17 *; | [XDY]WO0147807 (BIO MINERALS NV [BE], et al) [XD] 17,19 * page 2, line 7 - line 25 * * page 3, line 18 - line 20 * * examples A-G * [Y] 1-20; | [YD]WO03077657 (BIO MINERALS NV [BE], et al) [YD] 1-20 * abstract * * page 3, line 8 - line 14 * * Formulation 6 * * example - *; | [A]WO2009127256 (JISBREY S A [UY], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | [X] - EUROPEAN FOOD SAFETY AUTHORITY, "Choline-stabilised orthosilicid acid added for nutritional purposes to food supplements", THE EFSA JOURNAL, (2009), pages 1 - 23, XP002620118 [X] 1-3,6,8,9,11-14,16-20 * page 5; table 1 * * page 6, line 1 - line 3 * * page 6, paragraph last * | by applicant | WO03077657 | WO0147807 | - EPSTEIN E., SILICON ANNUAL REVIEW OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGY AND PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 50, pages 641 - 664 | - EPSTEIN E., ANNALS OF APPLIED BIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 155, pages 155 - 160 | - KVEDARAS O.L., ANNALS OF APPLIED BIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 155, pages 177 - 186 | - LIANG Y.C. ET AL., ENVIRONMENTAL POLLUTION, (2007), vol. 147, pages 422 - 428 | - BRUNINGS A.M. ET AL., ANNALS OF APPLIED BIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 155, pages 161 - 170 | - ROBBERECHT H. ET AL., SCIENCE OF THE TOTAL ENVIRONMENT, (2009), vol. 407, no. 16, pages 4777 - 4782 | - SRIPANYAKORN S. ET AL., BRITISH JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (2009), vol. 102, no. 6, pages 825 - 834 |