EP2264629 - Systems and methods of calculating electron dynamics using spin-dependent quantum trajectories [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Livermore Software Technology Corporation 7374 Las Positas Road Livermore, CA 94551 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Livermore Software Technology Corporation 7374 Las Positas Road Livermore CA 94551 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burke, Ritchie c/o Livermore Software Technology Corporation 737 Las Positas Road Livermore, CA 94551 / US | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10162670.3 | 12.05.2010 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | US20090484021 | 12.06.2009 Original published format: US 484021 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2264629 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
G16C10/00 (EP,US);
G06F30/20 (EP,US);
G16C60/00 (EP,US);
G06F2111/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Berechnung der Elektronendynamik mithilfe spinabhängiger Quantenbahnen | [2010/51] | English: | Systems and methods of calculating electron dynamics using spin-dependent quantum trajectories | [2010/51] | French: | Systèmes et procédés de calcul de la dynamique d'électrons utilisant des trajectoires quantiques dépendant du spin | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/22] | 13.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/12] | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - The claimed subject-matter, with due regard to the description and drawings in accordance with Art. 92 EPC, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject-matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art. 52(2) and (3) EPC. The information technology employed as an enabler for carrying out said processes is conventional. Its use for carrying out non-technical processes forms part of common general knowledge and it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing of the present application. No documentary evidence is therefore considered necessary. [L] 1-15 |