EP2251635 - Probe for three-dimensional shape measuring apparatus and three-dimensional shape measuring apparatus. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Funabashi, Takanori c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C, IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Araki, Takahisa c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C, IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Youkaichiya, Motoo c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C, IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/40] |
Former [2010/46] | 01 /
Funabashi, Takanori c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C, IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
Araki, Takahisa c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C, IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
Youkaichiya, Motoo c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C, IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2014/40] |
Former [2010/46] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10162743.8 | 12.05.2010 | [2010/46] | Priority number, date | JP20090118386 | 15.05.2009 Original published format: JP 2009118386 | JP20100098865 | 22.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010098865 | [2010/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2251635 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2251635 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | [2011/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2251635 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01B5/012, G01B5/016 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
G01B11/007 (EP);
G01B5/012 (EP);
G01B5/016 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | Sonde für eine dreidimensionale Formmessvorrichtung und dreidimensionale Formmessvorrichtung | [2010/46] | English: | Probe for three-dimensional shape measuring apparatus and three-dimensional shape measuring apparatus. | [2010/46] | French: | Sonde pour appareil de mesure de forme tridimensionnelle et appareil de mesure de forme tridimensionnelle | [2010/46] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 21.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2010 | AL | 01.10.2014 | AT | 01.10.2014 | BE | 01.10.2014 | BG | 01.10.2014 | CY | 01.10.2014 | CZ | 01.10.2014 | DK | 01.10.2014 | EE | 01.10.2014 | ES | 01.10.2014 | FI | 01.10.2014 | HR | 01.10.2014 | IT | 01.10.2014 | LT | 01.10.2014 | LV | 01.10.2014 | MC | 01.10.2014 | MK | 01.10.2014 | MT | 01.10.2014 | NL | 01.10.2014 | PL | 01.10.2014 | RO | 01.10.2014 | SE | 01.10.2014 | SI | 01.10.2014 | SK | 01.10.2014 | SM | 01.10.2014 | TR | 01.10.2014 | NO | 01.01.2015 | GR | 02.01.2015 | IS | 01.02.2015 | PT | 02.02.2015 | GB | 12.05.2015 | IE | 12.05.2015 | LU | 12.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | FR | 01.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 12.05.2010 | |
AT | 01.10.2014 | ||
BE | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 01.10.2014 | ||
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MK | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
SM | 01.10.2014 | ||
TR | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 12.05.2015 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
FR | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/46] | HU | 12.05.2010 | |
AT | 01.10.2014 | ||
BE | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 01.10.2014 | ||
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
SM | 01.10.2014 | ||
TR | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 12.05.2015 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
FR | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 12.05.2010 | |
AT | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 01.10.2014 | ||
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
SM | 01.10.2014 | ||
TR | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 12.05.2015 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
FR | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 12.05.2015 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
FR | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 12.05.2015 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
FR | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 12.05.2015 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 01.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO2007135857 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [ID] 1-10 * pages 1-22, figures 1-20 *; | [AD]JP2008292236 (PANASONIC CORP) [AD] 1-10 * pages 1-24, figures 1-19 *; | [A]US5209131 (BAXTER IAIN K [GB]) [A] 1-10 * column 13, line 51 - column 14, line 22, figures 1-20 *; | [A]US2005229420 (BRENNER KURT [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0025] and paragraph [0053], figures 1 and 3 *; | [A]US2006201012 (DALL AGLIO CARLO [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0096], figures 12, 13 * | by applicant | WO2007135857 | JP2008292236 | JPH10170243 | JPH041503 |