EP2256553 - Fluid handling structure and lithographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [2016/21] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riepen, Michel Rietbeek 9 5501 CA Veldhoven / NL | 02 /
Kemper, Nicolaas Eimerick 99 5653 RL Eindhoven / NL | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | Maas, Abraham Johannes, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property De Run 6501 P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/21] | Maas, Abraham Johannes, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2010/50] | Maas, Abraham Johannes, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2010/48] | Corcoran, Gregory Martin Mason ASML Netherlands B.V. CIP De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 10162904.6 | 17.05.2010 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | US20090181158P | 26.05.2009 Original published format: US 181158 P | US20090239555P | 03.09.2009 Original published format: US 239555 P | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2256553 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2256553 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
G03F7/70341 (EP,KR,US);
G03F1/66 (KR);
G03F7/2041 (KR);
H01L21/0274 (KR);
Y10T137/8376 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] |
Former [2010/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitshandhabungsstruktur und Lithographievorrichtung | [2010/48] | English: | Fluid handling structure and lithographic apparatus | [2010/48] | French: | Structure de manipulation de fluide et appareil lithographique | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/22] | 02.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.07.2015 | 02.07.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.05.2010 | AL | 25.05.2016 | AT | 25.05.2016 | BE | 25.05.2016 | BG | 25.05.2016 | CY | 25.05.2016 | CZ | 25.05.2016 | DK | 25.05.2016 | EE | 25.05.2016 | ES | 25.05.2016 | FI | 25.05.2016 | HR | 25.05.2016 | IT | 25.05.2016 | LT | 25.05.2016 | LV | 25.05.2016 | MC | 25.05.2016 | MK | 25.05.2016 | PL | 25.05.2016 | RO | 25.05.2016 | SE | 25.05.2016 | SI | 25.05.2016 | SK | 25.05.2016 | SM | 25.05.2016 | TR | 25.05.2016 | NO | 25.08.2016 | GR | 26.08.2016 | IS | 25.09.2016 | PT | 26.09.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
TR | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 25.05.2016 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 25.05.2016 | |
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 25.05.2016 | |
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 25.05.2016 | |
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 25.05.2016 | |
NO | 25.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1681597 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL]) [A] 1,14,15 * abstract * * figures 1,6 ** paragraphs [0001] , [0029] , [0038] *; | [XDI]US2008212046 (RIEPEN MICHEL [NL], et al) [XD] 1-6,8-10,13-15 * abstract * * figures 1-5,12,13 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0062] , [0077] - [0081] * [I] 7,11,12 | Examination | US2007085990 | by applicant | US4509852 | WO9949504 | EP1420300 | US2004136494 | US2004207824 | WO2005064405 | US2006119809 | US2008212046 | US20090506565 |