12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
20.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
07.02.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
15.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
01.03.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
25.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.11.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.10.2012 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
18.05.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
11.05.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2011 |
Publication of search report |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
07.10.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
21.01.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
22.10.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |