Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8689118 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2014 | B2 | US2010293495 | 18.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46780609 | 18.05.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5634117B | Global Dossier | 03.12.2014 | B2 | JP2010267263 | 25.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US46780609 | 18.05.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101907880B | Global Dossier | 25.03.2015 | B | CN101907880 | 08.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US46780609 | 18.05.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2254010 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2013 | B1 | EP2254010 | 09.11.2011 | A3 | EP2254010 | 24.11.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US46780609 | 18.05.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2470458 | 19.02.2014 | B | GB2470458 | 24.11.2010 | A | GB201007025D0 | 09.06.2010 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US46780609 | 18.05.2009 |